This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/17/2019 at 16:14:23 (UTC).

LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. MIRANDA PAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against MIRANDA PAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GARRETT L. WONG and ETHAN P. SCHULMAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7345

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

GARRETT L. WONG

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 25

PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEWS, JAMES MICHAEL

Attorney at GORDON-CREED, KELLEY, HOLL & SUGERMAN, LLP

1901 Harrison Street, 14Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

MOORE, ROBERT RORY

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-04-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-03-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-12-2019

Proof of Personal Service - Sky Kids, Inc.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63557215), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-09-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Proof of Personal Service - Miranda Pan

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63557215), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-09-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL

Proof of Personal Service - Tinker Preschool Cole Valley, Inc.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63557215), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-10-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Proof of Personal Service - Tinker Preschool, Inc.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63557215), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-10-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants Miranda Pan, Sky Kids, Inc., Tinker Preschool, Inc. and Tin

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE AND NOTICE OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-17-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Defendants Miranda Pan, Sky Kids, Inc., Tinker Preschool, Inc., and Ti

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Declaration of Stephanie Mariani in Support of Defendants Miranda Pan,

DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE MARIANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Declaration of Grayson W. Marshall, III ISO Defendants Request for Jud

DECLARATION OF GRAYSON W. MARSHALL, III IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; ***COURT REPORTER FEE ASSESSED FOR DEMURRER*** (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants Miranda Pan, Sky

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Proof of Service

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS MIRANDA PAN, SKY KIDS, INC., TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. AND TINKER PRESCHOOL COLE VALLEY, INC.'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC.'S COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF GRAYSON W. MARSHALL, ILL ISO DEFENDANTS'EQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE; REQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MIRANDA PAN, SKY KIDS, INC TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. AND TINKER PRESCHOOL COLE VALLEY, INC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, IN (TRANSACTION ID # 100082246) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

First Amended Complaint- Jury Trial Demanded

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64159318) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25

Notice of change of address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 64212412) FILED BY ATTORNEY MATTHEWS, JAMES MICHAEL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4919829R007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1800; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4919829F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0819703F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANT MIRANDA PAN, SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC.'S COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR. AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON SEPTEMBER 4, 2019. JUDGE: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR#8600, MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM, NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-17-2019 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 64212412) FILED BY ATTORNEY MATTHEWS, JAMES MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64159318) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS MIRANDA PAN, SKY KIDS, INC., TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. AND TINKER PRESCHOOL COLE VALLEY, INC.'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC.'S COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF GRAYSON W. MARSHALL, ILL ISO DEFENDANTS'EQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE; REQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MIRANDA PAN, SKY KIDS, INC TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. AND TINKER PRESCHOOL COLE VALLEY, INC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, IN (TRANSACTION ID # 100082246) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF GRAYSON W. MARSHALL, III IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; ***COURT REPORTER FEE ASSESSED FOR DEMURRER*** (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE MARIANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE AND NOTICE OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100081481) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-17-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$1800.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63557215), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-10-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63557215), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-10-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63557215), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-09-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63557215), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED JUL-09-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLE BEE GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT PAN, MIRANDA AN INDIVIDUAL SKY KIDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION TINKER PRESCHOOL, COLE VALLEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-04-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-03-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-12-2019 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEWS, JAMES MICHAEL