This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 02:42:52 (UTC).

LISA ASHBY VS. STRYKER CORPORATION, MCKESSON, A CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2013 LISA ASHBY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against STRYKER CORPORATION, MCKESSON, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5150

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHBY, LISA

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

STRYKER CORPORATION, MCKESSON, A CORPORATION

MCKESSON, A CORPORATION

STRYKER CORPORATION

DOES 1-20

MCKESSON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERSH, NANCY LEE

Attorney at HERSH & HERSH, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

601 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94102-6316

Defendant Attorneys

CAMPILLO, RALPH A.

Attorney at SEDGWICK, LLP

801 South Figueroa St 19Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

ROSATI, PAVAN LINARDOS

Attorney at JENKINS GOODMAN & NEUMAN

417 Montgomery St.10Thf Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA AS TO DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION, MCKESSON, A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-02-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-30-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-10-2014 (Fee:450.00)

NOTICE

NOTICE OF ONBJECTION TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-02-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-13-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON JUN-29-2015. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON NOV-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA AS TO DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION, MCKESSON, A CORPORATION DOES 1-20

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-19-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON JUN-29-2015. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON NOV-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • OBJECTION HEARING OCT-15-2014; JUDGE CYNTHIA LEE; CLERK KCOX; PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR OBJECTION HEARING HEARING SET FOR OCT-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ONBJECTION TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-29-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-15-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA AS TO DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION, MCKESSON, A CORPORATION DOES 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-02-2014 CONTINUED TO MAY-14-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASHBY, LISA AS TO DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION, MCKESSON, A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-02-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-30-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-10-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5150
Case Title:LISA ASHBY VS. STRYKER CORPORATION, MCKESSON, A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JUN-12-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, June 12, 2014, Line 10, DEFENDANT STRYKER CORPORATION'S MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINTDefendant's Motion to Strike is granted as to the allegations of a design defect in the first cause of action pursuant to Plaintiff's non-opposition and is moot as to punitive damages in light of the Court's ruling on Defendant's Demurrer. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4:00 p.m. stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if in pro per on the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRYKER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ralph A Campillo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSATI, PAVAN L