Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:24:29 (UTC).

LIONEL MYLES et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2007 LIONEL MYLES filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4127

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MYLES, LIONEL

MYLES, LOU

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.,FKA KAISER CEMENT CORP.

ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

CHEVRON U.S.A INC.

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS)

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

COLTEC INDUSTRIES INC.

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCLEOD, BRUCE EDWIN

Attorney at FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison St., 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero Center #2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Flr

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI,EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MARK SULLIVAN, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING

DECLARATION OF MARK SULLIVAN, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING (TRANSACTION ID # 17640710) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MYLES, LIONEL MYLES, LOU

DECLARATION OF JOSETTE D. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF JOSETTE D. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 18984783) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Exhibit E to the Declaration of Ralph Andino, III in Support of Defendant Scott Co. of Californias Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

EXHIBIT E TO THE DECLARATION OF RALPH ANDINO, III IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIAS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 19047083) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

DECLARATION OF JOHN B. GOLDSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS??? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF JOHN B. GOLDSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFT FOSTER WHEELER LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 19097373) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MYLES, LIONEL MYLES, LOU

Foster Wheelers MIL No. 5

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 19575804) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Foster Wheelers MIL No. 13

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 19575804) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Foster Wheelers MIL No. 21

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 19575804) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ORDER

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DISMISSALS (FILED IN CASE NO. CGC-82-828684) IN THE CASES ATTACHED IN EXHIBIT A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE [SEE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A] (TRANSACTION ID # 29131944)

Def. ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.s Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14597806) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporations Answer to Unverified Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14729353) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Scott Co. of Californias Objection to Use of Commissioner

DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIAS OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 15081405) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15081405) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF

MOTION FOR PREFERENCE / PREFERENTIAL SETTING, PROOF OF SERVICE / NTC OF MO & MO FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 17640710) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MYLES, LIONEL MYLES, LOU HEARING SET FOR JAN-15-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:40.00)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

Foster Wheelers MIL No. 18

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 19575804) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EXAMINATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES REGARDING PROXIMATE CAUSE

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EXAMINATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES REGARDING PROXIMATE CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 19622444) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation), only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20707145) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER,LLC(FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORP.)

135 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DISMISSALS (FILED IN CASE NO. CGC-82-828684) IN THE CASES ATTACHED IN EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE [SEE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A] (TRANSACTION ID # 29131944)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FILED. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 25094355) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS) WESTERN FIBERGLAS SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21965256) AS TO DEFENDANT VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21794666) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20707145) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER,LLC(FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORP.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20707028) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER,LLC(FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORP.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20685969) AS TO DEFENDANT SANTA FE BRAUN INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO C.F. BRAUN, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20540216)WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2008314J013 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON PURCELL, DOC#1901266402, TRUST TAG#20459, WARRANT #38002060, DATED JUN-27-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14705232) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14705232) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14642610) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF. ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 14597806) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14597806) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14597806) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14567644) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MYLES, LIONEL MYLES, LOU AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SCOTT COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where THOMAS DEE ENGINERRING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant