This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 06:37:01 (UTC).

LINDSAY GARVEY VS. BETTY MEYER

Case Summary

On 10/01/2012 LINDSAY GARVEY filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against BETTY MEYER. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2039

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

GARVEY, LINDSAY

Appellant and Defendant

MEYER, BETTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LYKKEN, MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY APPELLANT MEYER, BETTY

ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT

ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT MEYER, BETTY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: LYKKEN, MICHAEL R SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR MEYER, BETTY

Notice of Time and Place of Hearing on Appeal

SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR FEB-07-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525

Transmittal Receipt

TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (RECEIVED DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)

Transfer of Record Notice

CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED

NOTICE OF APPEAL (SIGNED BY APPELLANTS ATTORNEY: MICHAEL R. LYKKEN -

NOTICE OF APPEAL (SIGNED BY APPELLANTS ATTORNEY: MICHAEL R. LYKKEN - SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY TO BE FILED WITHIN 5DAY) APPEAL FORM STAMPED:"BY FAX" FILED BY APPELLANT MEYER, BETTY MAILED TO RESPONDENT GARVEY, LINDSAY (Fee:75.00)

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GARVEY, LINDSAY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MEYER, BETTY $10,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $160.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,160.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF NOV-19-2012 - CONTINUED ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION TO DEC-06-2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 506. "CHANGE OF VENUE REQUEST BY DEFENDANT DENIED. LESSEE LIVES IN SAN FRANCISCO AND LESSEE RECEIVED LEASE VIA MAIL & E-MAIL IN SAN FRANCISCO" PER JUDGE FISCHER. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: AMANDA FISCHER. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 85.00 - SERVED OCT-04-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MEYER, BETTY

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY GARVEY, LINDSAY AS TO DEFENDANT MEYER, BETTY ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR NOV-19-2012 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2014
  • DocketEXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketADDED TO EXHIBIT DESTRUCTION REPORT OF FEB-03-2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • DocketRECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (DEFENDANT/APPELLANT'S EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY APPELLANT MEYER, BETTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT MEYER, BETTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: LYKKEN, MICHAEL R SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR MEYER, BETTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR FEB-07-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (RECEIVED DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (SIGNED BY APPELLANTS ATTORNEY: MICHAEL R. LYKKEN - SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY TO BE FILED WITHIN 5DAY) APPEAL FORM STAMPED:"BY FAX" FILED BY APPELLANT MEYER, BETTY MAILED TO RESPONDENT GARVEY, LINDSAY (Fee:75.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GARVEY, LINDSAY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MEYER, BETTY $10,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $160.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,160.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF DEC-06-2012 - JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF DEC-06-2012 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF DEC-06-2012 BY JUDGE PRO TEM JEAN MILEFF. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: JEAN MILEFF. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR HEARING BEFORE PRO TEM JUDGE JEAN MILEFF FILED BY GARVEY, LINDSAY MEYER, BETTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF NOV-19-2012 - CONTINUED ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION TO DEC-06-2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 506. "CHANGE OF VENUE REQUEST BY DEFENDANT DENIED. LESSEE LIVES IN SAN FRANCISCO AND LESSEE RECEIVED LEASE VIA MAIL & E-MAIL IN SAN FRANCISCO" PER JUDGE FISCHER. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: AMANDA FISCHER. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR HEARING BEFORE PRO TEM JUDGE AMANDA FISCHER. FILED BY GARVEY, LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF VENUE CHALLENGE SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • DocketCHALLENGE OF VENUE FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT MEYER, BETTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 85.00 - SERVED OCT-04-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MEYER, BETTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY GARVEY, LINDSAY AS TO DEFENDANT MEYER, BETTY ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR NOV-19-2012 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less