This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/31/2019 at 11:51:15 (UTC).

LINDA MARONEY VS. INNNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 LINDA MARONEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INNNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4186

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARONEY, LINDA

GROONEY, SCOTT

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SOLCOM

YSTEMS, INC

EVEREST WATERPROOFING

DOES 1 TO 100

ALECKA PAVING

INNNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

CABLECOM

CABLECOM, LLC (INADVERTENTLY NAMED AS CABLECOM)

EVEREST WATERPROOFING & RESTORATION, INC.

EXTENET SYSTEMS , INC.

INNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS

SOLCOM, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SOLCOM")

ALECKA PAVING, INC.

CABLECOM, LLC

ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

ROES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

ROES 1 TO 100

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINAMI, DALE

Attorney at MINAMI TAMAKI LLP

360 Post Street 8Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MATHESON, BRIGGS

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

1390 Market Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

TUKIA, PHILLIP T.S.

Attorney at MARANGA & MORGENSTERN

350 Sansome St, Ste 630

San Francisco, CA 94104

BERDUX, SABRINA

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612

BERS, REBECCA A

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEYFOX PLAZA

1390 Market Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941025408

MORGENSTERN, ROBERT

Attorney at MARANGA MORGENSTERNA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

350 Sansome St., Ste 630

San Francisco, CA 94104

BUSTAMANTE, ROBERT MAURICE

Attorney at BUSTAMANTE & GAGLIASSO

2150 Trade Zone Blvd., Ste 204

San Jose, CA 95131

LAMPE, ROSS E.

Attorney at MURO & LAMPE, INC.

75 Iron Point Circle, Suite 155

Folsom, CA 95630

REDFIELD, CHARLES SCRANTON

Attorney at LOW BALL & LYNCH

505 Montgomery St. 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

WAITE, JAMES F

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTIAN B. GREEN

555 12Th Street, Ste 600

Oakland, CA 94607

LEVINE, RICHARD A.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTIAN B. GREEN

555 12Th Street, Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94607

GRIFFIN, JOHN T.

Attorney at HALL GRIFFIN LLP

1851 East First St., 10Th Flr

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100054788) FILED BY DEFENDANT CABLECOM, LLC (INADVERTENTLY NAMED AS CABLECOM) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO PLAINTIFF(S) AND CROSS COMPLAINANT(S)SET FOR SEP-18-2018 CONTINUED TO NOV-06-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) ALECKA PAVING; BRING CROSS COMPLAINTS AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service of Summons re ExteNet Systems

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034585), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT SERVED MAR-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT EXTENET SYSTEMS , INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62680551) FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT OF ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 62799663) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62688810) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100041959) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXTENET SYSTEMS , INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62186137) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SERVED JUN-06-2018, MAIL AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CABLECOM

Declaration of Houlihan re Service Attempts on Alecka Paving

DECLARATION RE SERVICE ATTEMPTS ON ALECKA PAVING (TRANSACTION ID # 100040399) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT

Request for Dismissal from Complaint as to Everest Waterproofing only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100045091) AS TO DEFENDANT EVEREST WATERPROOFING

DEFENDANT ALECKA PA YING, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS LINDA MARONEY AND

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62489413) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALECKA PAVING, INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100054374) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Cross-Complaint of Solcom, Inc. for Indemnity, Contribution and Declar

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033944) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SOLCOM, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "SOLCOM") AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS CABLECOM CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ALECKA PAVING EVEREST WATERPROOFING EXTENET SYSTEMS , INC. ROES 1 TO 100

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT AS TO DEFENDANT INNNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS CABLECOM YSTEMS, INC CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ALECKA PAVING EVEREST WATERPROOFING SOLCOM DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-09-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEM

OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AS TRIAL JUDGE [LOCAL RULE 3.3A] (TRANSACTION ID # 61938866) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100043894) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXTENET SYSTEMS , INC.

Plaintiffs Response to Order to Show Cause

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100047847) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R9218A03F014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R9218705J006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4918626J007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8018619J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R9818619J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : NO FEE ; Receipt Number : R4918614F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5618517J003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5618517F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918510F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518504F007

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61938746) FILED BY DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100035731) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXTENET SYSTEMS , INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034585), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT SERVED MAR-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SOLCOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034585), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT SERVED MAR-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT EVEREST WATERPROOFING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034585), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT SERVED MAR-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034585), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT SERVED MAR-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT EXTENET SYSTEMS , INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034585), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT SERVED MAR-14-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CABLECOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034585), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT SERVED MAR-28-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARONEY, LINDA GROONEY, SCOTT AS TO DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS CABLECOM CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ALECKA PAVING EVEREST WATERPROOFING SOLCOM DOES 1 TO 100 EXTENET SYSTEMS , INC. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-09-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less