This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 12:03:32 (UTC).

Lillie Webb Vs. The Hotel Donatello Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by Lillie Webb against The Hotel Donatello in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4344

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Teri L. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Webb, Lillie

Defendants

Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.

Does 1 To 10

The Hotel Donatello

Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (sued Erroneously Herein As The Hotel Donatello)

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61790459), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEBB, LILLIE SERVED FEB-22-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-24-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT THE HOTEL DONATELLO

Notice of Random Selection From Panel of Arbitrators

PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE SEP-27-2018.

PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR LYLE C. CAVIN, JR..

PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR LYLE C. CAVIN, JR..

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEBB, LILLIE AS TO DEFENDANT THE HOTEL DONATELLO WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61790459), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEBB, LILLIE SERVED FEB-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC.

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-17-2018. THE JUL-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator (CRC 3.815)

ARBITRATOR FRANK PATRICK KELLY APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION SEP-28-2018 THROUGH DEC-27-2018.

CMC Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62176263) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEBB, LILLIE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS INCs ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034003) FILED BY DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC. (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS THE HOTEL DONATELLO)

Case Management Conference Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041478) FILED BY DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC. (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS THE HOTEL DONATELLO) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W1518402F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1018215F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ARBITRATOR FRANK PATRICK KELLY APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION SEP-28-2018 THROUGH DEC-27-2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR LYLE C. CAVIN, JR..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE SEP-27-2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-17-2018. THE JUL-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041478) FILED BY DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC. (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS THE HOTEL DONATELLO) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62176263) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEBB, LILLIE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034003) FILED BY DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC. (SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS THE HOTEL DONATELLO) (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61790459), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEBB, LILLIE SERVED FEB-22-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-24-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT THE HOTEL DONATELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61790459), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEBB, LILLIE SERVED FEB-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEBB, LILLIE AS TO DEFENDANT THE HOTEL DONATELLO WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.