This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/31/2020 at 00:16:06 (UTC).

LILIT PAKHLOYAN VS. OPTUM360 SERVICES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/16/2016 LILIT PAKHLOYAN filed an Other lawsuit against OPTUM360 SERVICES INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN and TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5406

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION DBA OPTUM

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

DIGNITY HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES ORGANIZATION LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

OPTUM360 SERVICES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

OPTUM360 SERVICES INC.

DIGNITY HEALTH ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DIGNITY HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES ORGANIZATION, LLC

DIGNITY HEALTH MANAGEMENT ORGANIZATION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY, MARCUS J.

Attorney at BRADLEY GROMBACHER LLP

2815 Townsgate Rd., Suite #130

Westlake Village, CA 91361

MAJARIAM,II, SAHAG

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SAHAG MAJARIAN II

18250 Ventura Boulevard

Tarzana, CA 91356

Defendant Attorneys

MAECHTLEN, LAURA J.

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

560 Mission St. Ste. 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

SIMMONS, RICHARD J.

Attorney at SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

333 South Hope St 43Rd Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1422

MCQUEEN, DANIEL J.

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

333 South Hope Street, 43Rd Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100020581) FILED BY DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-26-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSED PER 7-26-17 ORDER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

Declaration of Marcus J. Bradley In Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte fo

DECLARATION OF MARCUS J. BRADLEY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100019525) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Dismissal of Action; Memorandum of

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 100019525) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-25-2017 CONTINUED TO SEP-26-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DISMISSAL ORDER IN DEPARTMENT 302. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Declaration of Marcus J. Bradley in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte For

DECLARATION OF MARCUS J. BRADLEY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100018467) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Dismissal of Action

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100018467) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUL-25-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE MAY-31-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-19-2017 CONTINUED TO MAY-31-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100013099) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100011892) FILED BY DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

Reply in Support of Defendants Optum360 Services Inc. and United Healt

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100011892) FILED BY DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

Defendant Dignity Healths Reply In Support of its Motion to Compel Arb

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100011747) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DIGNITY HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES ORGANIZATION, LLC

Order Denying Complex Designation For Failure to File Application Requ

ORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION. (MJ)

Amended Declaration of Plaintiff Lilit Pakhloyan in Support of Opposit

AMENDED DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF LILIT PAKHLOYAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. AND UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100011428) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice of Lodging of Non-California Authorities, Pursuant to Californi

NOTICE OF LODGING OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES, PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1113(I) (TRANSACTION ID # 100011426) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Declaration of Taylor L. Emerson, Esq. in Support of Opposition to Def

DECLARATION OF TAYLOR L. EMERSON, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DIGNITYS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100011426) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Sep-21-2017 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-26-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSED PER 7-26-17 ORDER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100020581) FILED BY DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B7817725M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MARCUS J. BRADLEY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100019525) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 100019525) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jul-17-2017 Continued To Sep-26-17 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-25-2017 CONTINUED TO SEP-26-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DISMISSAL ORDER IN DEPARTMENT 302. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • FinancialPayment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4917706E008

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100009282) FILED BY DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100009282) FILED BY DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. HEARING SET FOR FEB-15-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$2900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketCOURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 100009277) FILED BY DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100025192), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED DEC-06-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION DBA OPTUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100025191), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED DEC-06-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R0216C16F012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 100007690) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH MANAGEMENT ORGANIZATION, LLC (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1016B16F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAKHLOYAN, LILIT AN INDIVIDUAL, ON HER OWN BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT OPTUM360 SERVICES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION DIGNITY HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES ORGANIZATION LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION DBA OPTUM DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-19-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-17-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-27-2017 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5406
Case Title:LILIT PAKHLOYAN VS. OPTUM360 SERVICES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL
Court Date:APR-12-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Dignity Healths Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, April 12, 2017, Line 7, DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH's Motion To Compel Arbitration.The matter is taken off calendar per the agreement of the parties. =(302/HK)


Case Number:*******5406
Case Title:LILIT PAKHLOYAN VS. OPTUM360 SERVICES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL
Court Date:MAR-14-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Dignity Healths Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration
Rulings:Set for hearing for Tuesday, March 14, 2017, line 13. DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH'S Motion To Compel Arbitration. Continued to April 12, 2017 per the agreement of the parties. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******5406
Case Title:LILIT PAKHLOYAN VS. OPTUM360 SERVICES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL
Court Date:FEB-15-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Dignity Healths Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, February 15, 2017, Line 9, DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH's Motion To Compel Arbitration.Hearing is continued to March 14, 2017, per the agreement of the parties. =(302/HK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAECHTLEN LAURA JEAN