This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/03/2020 at 09:16:41 (UTC).

LILA L SCHMIDT VS. TIMOTHY J MARTENS MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 LILA L SCHMIDT filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TIMOTHY J MARTENS MD. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, GAIL DEKREON and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6774

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GAIL DEKREON

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHMIDT, LILA L

Defendants

SANA FRANCISCO CEWNTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

DOES 1 TO 50

MARTENS MD, TIMOTHY J AN INDIVIDUAL

MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KLEVEN, LEIF HARRISON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ALEIF KLEVEN

910 Hale Place, Suite 212

Chula Vista, CA 91915

REDCROW, ANDRIA CATALANO

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANDRIA CATALANO REDCROW

810 Hale Place, Suite 212

Chula Vista, CA 91915

Defendant Attorney

LYNCH, ROBERT THOMAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MADDEN & LYNCH

505 Sansome Street, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L AS TO DEFENDANT MARTENS MD, TIMOTHY J AN INDIVIDUAL MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-24-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-23-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-01-2018

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 100048805) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L AS TO DEFENDANT MARTENS MD, TIMOTHY J AN INDIVIDUAL

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 100048805) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-04-2020 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Electronic Service

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE [OF NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE] (TRANSACTION ID # 100073106) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE (TRANSACTION ID # 100073106) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L

Objection of Defendant Timothy J. Marten, M.D. to Notice of Time of Tr

OBJECTION OF DEFENDANT TIMOTHY J. MARTEN, M.D. TO NOTICE OF TIME OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 63304110) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS HEARING SET FOR JUN-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-20-2020 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-05-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63278295) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Proof of Electronic Service

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100071421) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100071421) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

Order Setting Case Management Conference from Order to Show Cause

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE APR-30-2019 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Defendants Notice of Entry of Order Setting Aside Default

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED - ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT (TRANSACTION ID # 63157694) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND DEFAULT OF SEP-24-2018 SET ASIDE

Answer of Defendant Timothy Marten, M.D. to Plaintiffs Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63146121) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: JOINTLY SUBMITTED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT; AND (2) RE-SETTING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 63137359) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS

Declaration of Elisabeth A. Madden In Support of Application to Enter

DECLARATION OF ELISABETH A. MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO ENTER STIPULATED ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT (TRANSACTION ID # 63137359) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS

Jointly Submitted Ex Parte Application for an Order (1) Setting Aside

JOINTLY SUBMITTED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT; AND (2) RE-SETTING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 63137359) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-04-2020 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketOBJECTION HEARING OF JUN-05-2019 HELD. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE [OF NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE] (TRANSACTION ID # 100073106) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE (TRANSACTION ID # 100073106) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION OF DEFENDANT TIMOTHY J. MARTEN, M.D. TO NOTICE OF TIME OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 63304110) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS HEARING SET FOR JUN-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-20-2020 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-05-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63278295) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTEN, TIMOTHY J. , M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND DBA MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY, AND DBA SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • FinancialPayment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8019514J004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100071421) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100071421) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L (Fee:$150.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100048805), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L SERVED JUN-01-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT MARTENS MD, TIMOTHY J AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 100048410) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L AS TO DEFENDANT MARTENS MD, TIMOTHY J AN INDIVIDUAL MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100048410) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L AS TO DEFENDANT MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100048410), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L SERVED MAY-29-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAY-30-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100048410) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100048410), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L SERVED MAY-25-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAY-29-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 100048221) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L AS TO DEFENDANT MARTENS MD, TIMOTHY J AN INDIVIDUAL MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0818524F002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SCHMIDT, LILA L AS TO DEFENDANT MARTENS MD, TIMOTHY J AN INDIVIDUAL MARTEN CLINIC OF PLASTIC SURGERY AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY SAN FRANCISCO CENTER FOR THE SURGICAL ARTS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-24-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-23-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-01-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYNCH, ROBERT THOMAS