This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 20:34:23 (UTC).

LEVI STRAUSS & CO VS. DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP

Case Summary

On 04/14/2009 LEVI STRAUSS CO filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7219

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

LEVI STRAUSS & CO

Respondents and Defendants

DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP

LEVI STRAUSS & CO. CONSOLIDATED CASE 487220

Other

GARCIA, DAVID A (COURT APPOINTED DISCOVERY REFEREE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

EPSTEIN, R. TALI

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

PRESTON, TRACY M

Attorney at LEVI STRAUSS & CO

1155 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

RESSLER, MARK P.

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON ET AL.

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

TAKENOUCHI, JASON S

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

101 California Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94111

GOODMAN, WILLIAM MARK

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN, LLP

101 California Street, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROMANOFF, EVAN S.

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

ROSSI, RONALD R

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10549

WALLACE, AMBER T.

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

ZIEMIANEK, MARGARET A.

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

101 California St, Ste 2300

San Francisco, CA 94111

GORECKI, MARIA

Respondent, Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWIS, ROBERT ARTHUR

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS, & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

KENNARD, KAREN LEANNE

Attorney at DELOITTE LLP

555 Mission Street, Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94105

PICKETT, DONN PHILIP

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKLIUS LLP

One Market Street, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1596

EPSTEIN, R. TALI

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

MCNAMARA, CHRISTOPHER J.

PRESTON, TRACY M

Attorney at LEVI STRAUSS & CO

1155 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

RESSLER, MARK P.

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON ET AL.

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

TAKENOUCHI, JASON S

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

101 California Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94111

GOODMAN, WILLIAM MARK

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN, LLP

101 California Street, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROMANOFF, EVAN S.

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

ROSSI, RONALD R

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10549

WALLACE, AMBER T.

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

ZIEMIANEK, MARGARET A.

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

101 California St, Ste 2300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS, ROBERT ARTHUR

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS, & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

KENNARD, KAREN LEANNE

Attorney at DELOITTE LLP

555 Mission Street, Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94105

PICKETT, DONN PHILIP

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKLIUS LLP

One Market Street, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1596

 

Court Documents

Declaration Of Steven OKane in Support of Levi Strauss & Co.s Opposition to Deloitte Consulting LLPs Motion for Summary Judgment on its Claims

DECLARATION OF STEVEN OKANE IN SUPPORT OF LEVI STRAUSS CO.S OPPOSITION TO DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS CLAIMS (TRANSACTION ID # 52452459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, SERVICES RENDERED AND ACCOUNT STATED

ORDER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO.'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS CLAIMS

PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO.S OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF DANIELLE NESTOR IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, SERVICES RENDERED AND AC

OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF DANIELLE NESTOR IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, SERVICES RENDERED AND ACCOUNT STATED (TRANSACTION ID # 52801865) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

Notice of Errata to (1) Declaration of Steven OKane in Support of Levi Strauss & Co.s Opposition to Deloitte Consulting LLPs Motion For Summary Judgment on Its Claims, And (2) Declaration of Hans Ploos van Amstel in Support of Levi Strauss & Co.s Opp

NOTICE OF ERRATA TO (1) DECLARATION OF STEVEN OKANE IN SUPPORT OF LEVI STRAUSS CO.S OPPOSITION TO DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS CLAIMS, AND (2) DECLARATION OF HANS PLOOS VAN AMSTEL IN SUPPORT OF LEVI STRAUSS CO.S OPPOSITION TO DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS CLAIMS (TRANSACTION ID # 52502796) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

Declaration of Christopher J. McNamara in Support of Levi Strauss & Co.s Opposition to Deloitte Consulting LLPs Motion for Summary Judgment on its Claims (Public Redacted Version)

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. MCNAMARA IN SUPPORT OF LEVI STRAUSS CO.S OPPOSITION TO DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS CLAIMS (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) (TRANSACTION ID # 52452459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

Declaration Of David Cantrell in Support of Levi Strauss & Co.s Opposition to Deloitte Consulting LLPs Motion for Summary Judgment on its Claims

DECLARATION OF DAVID CANTRELL IN SUPPORT OF LEVI STRAUSS CO.S OPPOSITION TO DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS CLAIMS (TRANSACTION ID # 52452459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co.s Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Deloitte Consulting LLPs Motion for Summary Judgment on its Claims

OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS CLAIMS (TRANSACTION ID # 52452459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

Plaintiff Levi Strauss & Co.s Separate Statement in Opposition to Deloitte Consulting LLPs Motion For Summary Judgment on its Claims (Public Redacted Version)

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS CLAIMS (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) (TRANSACTION ID # 52452459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

COMPLAINT

FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO AS TO DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-11-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-15-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-27-2009 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:915.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION

NOT REPORTED. THE APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX DESIGNATION IS GRANTED. THE ACTION IS SINGLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE RICHARD A. KRAMER, IN DEPT. 304, FOR ALL PURPOSES. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR AUG-24-2009, AT 9:30 AM, IN DEPT. 304. THE SEP-11-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. JUDGE RICHARD A. KRAMER; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; DEPT. 304.

MINUTES FOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2009 AT 1:30 PM

MINUTES FOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2009 AT 1:30 PM DEPT 304

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-09-487220 WITH CASE

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS, ORDER

MINUTES FOR OCTOBER 28, 2009 AT 1:30 PM

MINUTES FOR OCTOBER 28, 2009 AT 1:30 PM DEPT 304

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT FILED IN CASE NO. CGC 09- 487220) FILED BY DEFENDANT LEVI STRAUSS & CO. CONSOLIDATED CASE 487220 (Fee:NO FEE)

MINUTES FOR DECEMBER 31, 2009 AT 9:30 AM

MINUTES FOR DECEMBER 31, 2009 AT 9:30 AM DEPT 304

835 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • HEARING ON MOTIONS ON MAR-30-2016. MOTIONS ARE ARGUED AND TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON MAR-30-2016 BY CURTIS KARNOW. JUDGE CURTIS E.A. KARNOW, CLERK DANIAL LEMIRE, REPORTER TAMRA KEEN, CSR 5404.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR MAR-30-2016 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58778603) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COUNTER STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DELOITTES MOTION IN LIMINE, MOTION FOR EVIDENCE AND MONEY SANCTIONS, AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO EIGHTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (TRANSACTION ID # 58778603) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763382) FILED BY DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GEOFFREY T. HOLTZ IN SUPPORT OF DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED CONTRACT BREACHES DISCLOSED IN LEVIS RESPONSES TO EIGHTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES, AND (2) MOTION FOR EVIDENCE AND MONEY SANCTIONS REGARDING LEVIS RESPONSES TO EIGHTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND TO REOPEN DISCOVERY (TRANSACTION ID # 58763382) FILED BY DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY BRIEF RE DELOITTE CONSULTING LLPS (1) MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED CONTRACT BREACHES DISCLOSED IN LEVIS RESPONSES TO EIGHTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES, AND (2) MOTION FOR EVIDENCE AND MONEY SANCTIONS REGARDING LEVIS RESPONSES TO EIGHTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND TO REOPEN DISCOVERY (TRANSACTION ID # 58763382) FILED BY DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER NO.7 (TRANSACTION #58743474)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DELOITTE MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE OPINION OF DR. RAO (TRANSACTION #58743474)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58737378) FILED BY DEFENDANT LEVI STRAUSS & CO. CONSOLIDATED CASE 487220

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,127 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2009
  • LAW AND MOTION 301, NO APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: VERIFIED APPLICATION OF R. TALI EPSTEIN TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR THE PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & COMPANY IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. (R. TALI EPSTEIN OF THE KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP, 1633 BROADWAY, NEW YORK, NY, 10019, TEL. NO. (212)506-1700) MOVING PARTY IS TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER. JUDGE: RONALD EVANS QUIDACHAY, REPORTER: ROBERT BALIAN, CSR # 5220 301/REQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • LAW AND MOTION 301, NO APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: VERIFIED APPLICATION OF MARK P. RESSLER TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR THE PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & COMPANY'S IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. (MARK P. RESSLER OF THE KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP, 1633 BROADWAY, NEW YORK, NY, 10019; TEL. NO. (212) 506-1700). MOVING PARTY IS TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER. JUDGE: RONALD EVANS QUIDACHAY, REPORTER: ROBERT BALIAN, CSR # 5220 301/REQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP HEARING SET FOR JUN-08-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:NO FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP HEARING SET FOR JUN-08-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOS AND JOINDER TO DESIGNATION OF CASE AS COMPLEX FILED BY DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP (Fee:915.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, PROOF OF SERVICE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF R. TALI EPSTEIN TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO HEARING SET FOR MAY-21-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:250.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF MARK P. RESSLER TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT; POS IN SUPPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO HEARING SET FOR MAY-21-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:250.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO (Fee:40.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEVI STRAUSS & CO AS TO DEFENDANT DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-11-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-15-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-27-2009 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:915.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less