This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/11/2023 at 07:09:36 (UTC).

LEONARD ROBY VS. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 LEONARD ROBY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG and ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9731

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBY, LEONARD

Claimant

HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 25

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Cross Defendants

CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROES 1 -10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBERST, ANDREW C

Claimant Attorney

AVAKIAN, ANI P.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

HAGOPIAN, MARK ANDREW

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIEN BY HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF LIEN (TRANSACTION ID # 100195933) FILED BY CLAIMANT HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-22-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-12-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100195016) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210032316) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO (TRANSACTION ID # 69665649)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-08-2023 CONTINUED TO APR-12-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case management statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68966597) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 100188554) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD

Plaintiffs Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100188554) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-21-2022 CONTINUED TO FEB-08-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68065598) TO CROSS COMPLAINANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Plaintiffs Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100178150) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-19-2022 CONTINUED TO DEC-21-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67991278) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ROES 1 -10

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67991278) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100164807) TO PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Civil Case Coversheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100164807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2024
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Mar-30-2023 Set For Trial On Apr-22-24 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIEN (TRANSACTION ID # 100195933) FILED BY CLAIMANT HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-22-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-12-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C5023328J001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100195016) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210032316) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 210032316) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO (TRANSACTION ID # 69665649)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jan-26-2023 Continued To Apr-12-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100178150) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-19-2022 CONTINUED TO DEC-21-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R5222908F005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67991278) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ROES 1 -10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67991278) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100164807) TO PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122520F025

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100164807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100164807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBY, LEONARD AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 25 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-19-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-26-2022; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less