This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 14:24:40 (UTC).

LAUREL RHEA MAY VS. AARON GEOFFREY MAY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 LAUREL RHEA MAY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AARON GEOFFREY MAY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8714

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAY, LAUREL RHEA

San Francisco, CA 94110

Respondent

MAY, AARON GEOFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2013
  • CLERK REJECT LETTER - PAPERWORK RETURNED 7/17/13, NON COMPLIANCE OF REJECT LETTER DATED 6/24/13. REFER TO ACCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT MAY, AARON GEOFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • DECLARATION OF SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER MAY, LAUREL RHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER MAY, LAUREL RHEA AS TO RESPONDENT MAY, AARON GEOFFREY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less