Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/07/2019 at 10:56:16 (UTC).

LARRY WHITE VS. HONORABLE PAUL ALVARADO ET AL (Provide Access)

Case Summary

On 09/27/2016 LARRY WHITE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HONORABLE PAUL ALVARADO Provide Access. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4535

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WHITE, LARRY

Calipatria, CA 92233

WHITE, LARRY CALIPATRIA STATE PRISON G37720 CALIPATRIA, CA 92233

Defendants

YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JUDSON, CRAIG LAWRENCE

Attorney at BOLD POLISNER ET AL

500 Ygnacio Vly Rd #325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-05-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100015743)

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-03-2017 CONTINUED TO JUL-05-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER RE: DEMURRER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-01-2017 CONTINUED TO MAY-03-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER RE: DEMURRER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Entry of Judgment Or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND (TRANSACTION ID # 100009555) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR LARRY WHITE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY THROUGH COURT CALL

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF DEMURRER OBJECTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF MOTION TO RECUSE HEARING JUDGE HAROLD E. KAHN FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY AS TO DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Reply To Opposition To Demurre

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 59932627) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59852919) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Demurrer of Defenda

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS THE HONORABLE PAUL ALVARADO AND THE HONORABLE CAROL YAGGY (TRANSACTION ID # 59852919) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

Notice of Demurrer

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59852919) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL HEARING SET FOR DEC-19-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY AS TO DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-01-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-28-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-06-2017

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2016
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : B5216B18R016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : B5216B18F015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP ; Receipt Number : R6416927F023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-05-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100015743)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-03-2017 CONTINUED TO JUL-05-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER RE: DEMURRER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-01-2017 CONTINUED TO MAY-03-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER RE: DEMURRER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND (TRANSACTION ID # 100009555) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 59932627) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59852919) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 59852919) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS THE HONORABLE PAUL ALVARADO AND THE HONORABLE CAROL YAGGY (TRANSACTION ID # 59852919) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59852919) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL HEARING SET FOR DEC-19-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITE, LARRY AS TO DEFENDANT ALVARADO, HONORABLE PAUL YAGGY, HONORABLE CAROL NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-01-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-28-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-06-2017 (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig L. Judson