This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/23/2016 at 18:10:30 (UTC).

LARRY GLADDEN VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2008 LARRY GLADDEN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4852

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

CONSOLIDATED ELECTRICAL DISTRIBUTORS, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SBM TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

LARCHMONT CORPORATION

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

MAREMONT CORPORATION

GATKE CORPORATION

AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION

VIDA'S SAVING CENTER

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY

LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

69 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HILLYARD, MARY KIRK

Attorney at PRINDLE, AMARO, GOETZ, HILLYARD, BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

One California Street, Suite 1910

San Francisco, CA 94111

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

GAMBA, PAUL JOSEPH

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery St, 6Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 N Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP; ATTORNEYS AT LAW

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

CURLIANO, JASON J

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 - 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

SPIRA, KIRSTEN HICKS

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive,, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KEARNEY, SANDRA A

Attorney at FARELLA BRAUN & MARTEL LLP

235 Montgomery Street,17Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of NVE Constructors, Inc.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE, ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT, PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET, ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES, STATEMENT OF DAMAGES, AND MASTER COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY(TRANSACTION ID # 48702720), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLADDEN, LARRY SERVED OCT-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NVE CONSTRUCTORS, INC.

ORDER

ORDER ADDING CASE TO FEBRUARY 16, 2012 STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal as to City Lights Lighting Showroom

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40866226) AS TO DEFENDANT CITY LIGHTS LIGHTING SHOWROOM (FKA CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT?S TRUE NAME FOR DOE 1

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFT'S TRUE NAME FOR DOE 1 (TRANSACTION ID # 30950975) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLADDEN, LARRY (Fee:40.00)

MIL 3: CRANE CO.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO STUDIES CONDUCTED BY WILLIAM LONGO, RICHARD HATFIELD, ET AL.

MIL 3: CRANE CO.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO STUDIES CONDUCTED BY WILLIAM LONGO, RICHARD HATFIELD, ET AL. (TRANSACTION ID # 47435444) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 1005

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOE 1005 (TRANSACTION ID # 54897677) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLADDEN, LARRY

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 40176570) AS TO DEFENDANT HEIECK SUPPLY

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE LAY OPINIONS THAT ASBESTOS FIBERS WERE RELEASED OR THAT VISIBLE DUST CONTAINED ASBESTOS FIBERS - Motion in Limine No. 14

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE LAY OPINIONS THAT ASBESTOS FIBERS WERE RELEASED OR THAT VISIBLE DUST CONTAINED ASBESTOS FIBERS - MIL NO. 14 (TRANSACTION ID # 34725939) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

MIL 11: CRANE CO.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR MEDICAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNT PAID

MIL 11: CRANE CO.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR MEDICAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNT PAID (TRANSACTION ID # 47435444) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

202 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2016
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-03-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-07-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. GEOFF SLONIKER, ESQ. APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58646123)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JUN-18-2015 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON MAR-03-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION, CASE RESOLVED PER PLAINTIFF. ANDREW CHEW APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. NO APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT RPI (PLANT INSULATION CO.). JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (877)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-11-2014 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-18-2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: TARA WILLIAMS, CSR#13428 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • ADVANCED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-18-2014 TO DEC-11-2014 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT) (TRANSACTION ID # 55146863), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLADDEN, LARRY SERVED FEB-12-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT RPI COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 55146575) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT RPI COMPANY (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 55146575) FILED BY DEFENDANT RPI COMPANY (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 54927400) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1005 TO BE RPI COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFT'S TRUE NAME FOR DOE 1005 (TRANSACTION ID # 54927400) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLADDEN, LARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
248 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22847551) FILED BY DEFENDANT SQUARE D. COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 22780007) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 22780007) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 22780007) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22780007) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22715708) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE BROS. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22630084) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLADDEN, LARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLADDEN, LARRY AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-15-2009 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4852
Case Title:LARRY GLADDEN VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al
Court Date:OCT-05-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Joinder To Vida'S Saving Center'S Mo To Dismiss Pursuant To California Code Of Civil Procedure Sections 583.410 And 583.420 And California Rule Of Court 3.1342.
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, October 5, 2011 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 1. Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.u00BFs joinder defendant Vida Savings Centeru00BFs motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute is denied without prejudice. The underlying motion was taken off calendar and defendantu00BFs joinder failed to provide proper notice pursuant to CRC 3.1342. Defendant may re-file to comply with the notice provisions of CRC 3.1342. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:45am in Dept. 503, not 9:30am in Dept. 220. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. = (503/TLJ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Larchmont is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY is a litigant