This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:42:07 (UTC).

LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA VS. MARJORIE MANZELLA et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARJORIE MANZELLA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4191

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

San Francisco, CA 94114

MANZELLA, MARJORIE

San Francisco, CA 94114

MANZELLA, ANTHONY

San Francisco, CA 94114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEADBETTER, DENISE ANN

Attorney at DENISE A LEADBETTER

505 Montogomery St 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

LEE, CINDY

Attorney at EVICTION ASSISTANCE

14 Precita Ave.

San Francisco, CA 94110

 

Court Documents

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY HEARING SET FOR APR-09-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1994 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 AS TO DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1994 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 SERVED FEB-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE (Fee:60.00)

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY HEARING SET FOR MAY-30-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $570.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JUN-25-2013, FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

ORDER

ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ONDEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AENDED COMPLAINT [HEARING ADVANCED FROM APR-09-2013 TO MAR-28-2013]

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1994 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 AS TO DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY HEARING SET FOR MAR-29-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:450.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: DEFTS DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER

ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1994 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 SERVED APR-02-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $570.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JUN-25-2013, FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON JUN-03-2013 IN DEPT. 611, DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON JUN-03-2013 IN DEPT. 611, MOTION TO STRIKE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, DEFENDANT MARJORIE MANZELLA AND ANTHONY MANZELLA'S MOTION TO STRIKE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED TO JUNE 3, 2013 AT 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 611 TO BE HEARD BY VISITING JUDGE O'MALLEY-TAYLOR. JUDGE RONALD E QUIDACHAY, CLERK K. LIU, NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501,DEFENDANT MARJORIE MANZELLA AND ANTHONY MANZELLA'S MOTION TO STRIKE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED TO JUNE 3, 2013 AT 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 611 TO BE HEARD BY VISITING JUDGE O'MALLEY-TAYLOR. JUDGE RONALD E QUIDACHAY, CLERK K. LIU, NOT REPORTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-30-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-30-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • MOTION TO STRIKE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY HEARING SET FOR MAY-30-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ONDEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AENDED COMPLAINT [HEARING ADVANCED FROM APR-09-2013 TO MAR-28-2013]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE OF DEFTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1994 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY HEARING SET FOR APR-09-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1994 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 AS TO DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY HEARING SET FOR MAR-29-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1994 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 SERVED FEB-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LARRICK, PATRICIA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MARTHA P. LANGE LIVING TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1994 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 AS TO DEFENDANT MANZELLA, MARJORIE MANZELLA, ANTHONY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less