This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 02:15:59 (UTC).

KYE RORIE IV VS. LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2013 KYE RORIE IV filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LUXOR CABS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5063

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RORIE IV, KYE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50, INCL.

LAZAR, JOHN M.

LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEMMON, THOMAS H.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBBINS, FETTER & LEMMON

436 14 Th Street, Suite 405

Oakland, CA 94612

FITZGERALD, WILLIAM FRANCIS

946 Junipero Serra Boulevard

San Francisco, CA 94132

Defendant Attorney

JENSEN, AMY K.

Attorney at HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

One California Street,, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94116

 

Court Documents

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-03-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY CLERK OF THE COURT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY CLERK OF THE COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 56594620) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RORIE IV, KYE

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-20-2015 CONTINUED TO MAR-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56543422)

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-18-2014 HELD AND SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JAN-20-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (6.0)

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, ADVANCED FROM NOV-21-2014 TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT NOV-18-2014 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON. (1.0)

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR NOV-21-2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON.

Association Of Counsel

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 56110082): FITZGERALD, WILLIAM FRANCIS ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR RORIE IV, KYE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M.

ORDER

ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION RE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-20-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-26-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Plaintiff Kye Rories Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 55119781) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RORIE IV, KYE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M. (Fee:900.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RORIE IV, KYE AS TO DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M. DOES 1 TO 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-26-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-24-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-03-2014 (Fee:450.00)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-03-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY CLERK OF THE COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 56594620) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RORIE IV, KYE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-20-2015 CONTINUED TO MAR-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56543422)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-18-2014 HELD AND SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JAN-20-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (6.0)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-08-2014 - CASE SETTLED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, ADVANCED FROM NOV-21-2014 TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT NOV-18-2014 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON. (1.0)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR NOV-21-2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 56110082): FITZGERALD, WILLIAM FRANCIS ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR RORIE IV, KYE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL AND/OR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M. HEARING SET FOR SEP-11-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketREVIEW FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF RORIE IV, KYE (Fee:150.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-20-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-26-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 55119781) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RORIE IV, KYE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M. (Fee:900.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RORIE IV, KYE AS TO DEFENDANT LUXOR CABS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LAZAR, JOHN M. DOES 1 TO 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-26-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-24-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-03-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUXOR CABS, INC., DBA LUXOR CAB COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy K Jensen