Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 08:49:38 (UTC).

KRISTIN FREELAND ET AL VS. BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2016 KRISTIN FREELAND filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0947

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC.

GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE

DOES 1 TO 50

BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY

HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTRIDE, ADAM

Attorney at GUTRIDE SAFIER LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

LAFAYETTE, GARY TRACY

Attorney at LAFAYETTE & KUMAGAI LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94612

MANOLIUS, KIMON

Attorney at HANSON BRIDGET LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC. DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-17-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-13-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-25-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Related Case; Proof of Service

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58731801) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION; REQUEST TO RELATE CASES; PRO

APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION; REQUEST TO RELATE CASES; PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58732139) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:60.00)

Defendants Golden Gate Bridge Highway and Transportation District and

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763555) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT (Fee:EXEMPT)

Declaration of Nicole S. Witt in Support of Defendants Golden Gate Bri

DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763555) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Proof of Electronic Service

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (OPPOSITION AND DECLARATION) (TRANSACTION ID # 58763555) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Exhibits A thru B In Support of Declaration of Nicole S. Witt in Suppo

EXHIBITS A THRU B IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763775) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Exhibits C thru E In Support of Declaration of Nicole S. Witt in Suppo

EXHIBITS C THRU E IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763775) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Exhibit F In Support of Declaration of Nicole S. Witt in Support of De

EXHIBIT F IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763775) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Defendant Golden Gate Bridge Highway and Transportation Districts Answ

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58881007) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Defendant Bay Area Toll Authoritys Answer to Plaintiffs Class Action C

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58881071) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58881272) FILED BY DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC. (Fee:1450.00)

Order Granting Complex Designation and for Single Assignment

ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION AND FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE CURTIS KARNOW FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-13-2016 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 304. AUG-17-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58909970) FILED BY ATTORNEY LAFAYETTE, GARY TRACY

Joint Case Management Statement

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58987327) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2016 2:00 PM

MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2016 2:00 PM

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2016 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58987327) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58909970) FILED BY ATTORNEY LAFAYETTE, GARY TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION AND FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE CURTIS KARNOW FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-13-2016 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 304. AUG-17-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58881272) FILED BY DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC. (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58881071) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58881007) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT F IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763775) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS C THRU E IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763775) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS A THRU B IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763775) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (OPPOSITION AND DECLARATION) (TRANSACTION ID # 58763555) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763555) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763555) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION; REQUEST TO RELATE CASES; PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58732139) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58731801) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FREELAND, KRISTIN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED JEFFERSON, MICHAEL INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC. DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-17-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-13-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-25-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XEROX STATE & LOCAL SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant