Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 17:22:52 (UTC).

KOLETTE BECKER VS. MAQUET, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2011 KOLETTE BECKER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MAQUET, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0551

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BECKER, KOLETTE

Defendants

MAQUET, INC.

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

GILROY, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, MARK S

Attorney at MAYALL, HURLEY, KNUTSEN, SMITH & GREEN

2453 Grand Canal Boulevard, Second Floor

Stockton, CA 95207

Defendant Attorney

KNEE, HOWARD M.

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

1925 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN HEARING SET FOR APR-06-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (UNDISPUTED) IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS ON MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCS FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF COLLEEN A. CAROLAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF SUSAN HUGHES IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF KEVING GILROY IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF RON SANDERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MTNF OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GILROY, KEVIN (Fee:410.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT NOTICE TO PLNTF., ADR PROGRAM INFORMATION PACKAGE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE SERVED MAY-04-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-24-2011 ON DEFENDANT GILROY, KEVIN

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR FEB-08-2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-07-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-30-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE MEDIATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-08-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-28-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUN-07-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. MAR-28-2012 MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-07-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-07-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS MAQUET, INC. AND KEVIN GILROY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. CASE SETTLED. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD CSR #7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-06-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-07-2012 - BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUN-07-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. MAR-28-2012 MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ERRATA IN SUPP OF DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMM JUDGMNT FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-08-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-28-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-07-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-30-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR FEB-08-2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT NOTICE TO PLNTF., ADR PROGRAM INFORMATION PACKAGE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE SERVED MAY-04-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-24-2011 ON DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT NOTICE TO PLNTF., ADR PROGRAM INFORMATION PACKAGE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE SERVED MAY-04-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-24-2011 ON DEFENDANT GILROY, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GILROY, KEVIN (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BECKER, KOLETTE AS TO DEFENDANT MAQUET, INC. GILROY, KEVIN DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-30-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-27-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-15-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAQUET, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS MARK SAMUEL