Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/12/2019 at 10:50:20 (UTC).

KIMBERLY WITTRY VS. MARC HARRIS JACOBS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 KIMBERLY WITTRY filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MARC HARRIS JACOBS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0363

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WITTRY, KIMBERLY

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

JACOBS, MARC HARRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGAL, JOEL HUGO

Attorney at JOEL H. SIEGAL

235 Montgomery St Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

FIORENTINO, LYNN RENE

Attorney at ARENT FOX LLP

55 2Nd St 21St Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-13-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH SIDE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES. (TRANSACTION ID # 100060580)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WITTRY, KIMBERLY AS TO DEFENDANT JACOBS, MARC HARRIS DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-13-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-10-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-19-2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • Payment : OUT OF STATE DEPOSITION; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1618B27O016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1618B27F015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018A09F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-13-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH SIDE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES. (TRANSACTION ID # 100060580)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • ISSUING COMMISSION TO TAKE DEPOSITION OUT OF STATE UNDER CCP 2026 FILED BY DEFENDANT JACOBS, MARC HARRIS (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PD FILED BY DEFENDANT JACOBS, MARC HARRIS (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WITTRY, KIMBERLY AS TO DEFENDANT JACOBS, MARC HARRIS DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-13-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-10-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-19-2019 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIORENTINO, LYNN R