This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/27/2023 at 01:00:24 (UTC).

KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS. CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC., A CALIFORNIA COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC , A CALIFORNIA COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2543

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

BARRY R. BLUE, AN INDIVIDUAL

CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC., A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

MARCEL BRUETSCH, AN INDIVIDUAL

MURAL MEDIA LLC 401K, AN OREGON ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM AND STATUS

PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO BARRY R. BLUE IRA 20007094L

PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO RICHARD KATZ IRA 080000041995

PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO SYLLA KATZ IRA 080000001321

RICHARD KATZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

SYLLA KATZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

THOMAS MALGESINI, AN INDIVIDUAL

YOSEMITE CAPITAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BRUETSCH, MARCEL

CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIMMONS, PAMELA D

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF PAMELA D. SIMMONS

2425 Porter St Suite 10

Soquel, CA 95073

FREDMAN, PETER B

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF PETER FREDMAN

125 University Ave., Suite 102

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorney

WELLS, KRISTI M.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD T. WEBER

17151 Newhope Street, Suite 203

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

 

Court Documents

Complaint For Damages And Injunctive Relief

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100180210) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC., A CALIFORNIA COMPANY MARCEL BRUETSCH, AN INDIVIDUAL YOSEMITE CAPITAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THOMAS MALGESINI, AN INDIVIDUAL PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO RICHARD KATZ IRA 080000041995 RICHARD KATZ, AN INDIVIDUAL PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO SYLLA KATZ IRA 080000001321 SYLLA KATZ, AN INDIVIDUAL PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO BARRY R. BLUE IRA 20007094L BARRY R. BLUE, AN INDIVIDUAL MURAL MEDIA LLC 401K, AN OREGON ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM AND STATUS DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-29-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-23-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-06-2023

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE TO ENJOIN NON-JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF PETER FREDMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plain

DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100180690) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC. BRUETSCH, MARCEL

Declaration of Marcel Bruetsch in Opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Ap

DECLARATION OF MARCEL BRUETSCH IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100180690) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC. BRUETSCH, MARCEL

DECLARATION OF

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER FREDMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC TO ENJOIN NON-JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

ORDER

ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100181241)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100181241)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER FREDMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC TO ENJOIN NON-JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $870; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H4522A31F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MARCEL BRUETSCH IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100180690) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC. BRUETSCH, MARCEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100180690) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC. BRUETSCH, MARCEL; Fee: $870.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PETER FREDMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO/OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialPayment: MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number: W2222A27M001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE TO ENJOIN NON-JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122A26F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100180210) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY GLADSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CAPITAL BENEFIT, INC., A CALIFORNIA COMPANY MARCEL BRUETSCH, AN INDIVIDUAL YOSEMITE CAPITAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THOMAS MALGESINI, AN INDIVIDUAL PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO RICHARD KATZ IRA 080000041995 RICHARD KATZ, AN INDIVIDUAL PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO SYLLA KATZ IRA 080000001321 SYLLA KATZ, AN INDIVIDUAL PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A/K/A PACIFIC PREMIER TRUST, CUSTODIAN FBO BARRY R. BLUE IRA 20007094L BARRY R. BLUE, AN INDIVIDUAL MURAL MEDIA LLC 401K, AN OREGON ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM AND STATUS DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-29-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-23-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-06-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less