This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/27/2021 at 12:20:55 (UTC).

KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. VS. 303 SECOND ST SF LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 KILROY REALTY 303, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 303 SECOND ST SF LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8229

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY

KNOTEL, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITMAN, TODD E

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE & MALLORY LLI

1901 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

GLUCK, MATTHEW

Attorney at GLUCK DANIEL LLP

One Sansome Street, Suite 720

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT 303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY KNOTEL, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-12-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-08-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-19-2021

Proof of Service (Summons) -- 303 Second ST SF LLC

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022107), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED DEC-18-2020, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT 303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY

Proof of Service (Summons) -- Knotel, Inc.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022107), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED DEC-18-2020, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT KNOTEL, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER;TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER;ORDER

APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER;TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER;ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE AP

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DECLARATION OF EILEEN KONG SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION

DECLARATION OF EILEEN KONG SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DECLARATION OF TODD E. WHITMAN REGARDING EX PARTE NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF

DECLARATION OF TODD E. WHITMAN REGARDING EX PARTE NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. GLUCK IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE A

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. GLUCK IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100119914) FILED BY DEFENDANT 303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100119914) FILED BY DEFENDANT 303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 100123543) FILED BY DEFENDANT KNOTEL, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-12-2021 CONTINUED TO NOV-10-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100129671)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-23-2021 Continued To Nov-10-21 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100129671)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-12-2021 CONTINUED TO NOV-10-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 100123543) FILED BY DEFENDANT KNOTEL, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4520C30M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100119914) FILED BY DEFENDANT 303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. GLUCK IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100119914) FILED BY DEFENDANT 303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TODD E. WHITMAN REGARDING EX PARTE NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF EILEEN KONG SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER;TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER;ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketFEE FOR EX PARTE RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (RESIDENT) (TRANSACTION ID # 200022123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022107), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED DEC-18-2020, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT KNOTEL, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022107), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED DEC-18-2020, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT 303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0920C08F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KILROY REALTY 303, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT 303 SECOND ST SF LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY KNOTEL, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-12-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-08-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-19-2021 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNOTEL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLUCK, MATTHEW J.