This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:04 (UTC).

KHOLOUD ALNEMRI VS. WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 KHOLOUD ALNEMRI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8419

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD

Defendants

WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DBA WEST CONSTRUCTIOIN (ERRONEOUSLY NAMEED AND SUED HEREIN AS WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.)

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL, ISSA J.

Attorney at THE MICHAEL LAW FIRM

1648 Union Street, Suite 201

San Francisco, CA 94123

Defendant Attorney

WILCOX, WENDY

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

33 New Montgomery St Ste 1250

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DBA WEST CONSTRUCTIOIN (ERRONEOUSLY NAMEED AND SUED HEREIN AS WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.) (Fee:450.00)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-13-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-03-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD SERVED FEB-05-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY WILCOX, WENDY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DBA WEST CONSTRUCTIOIN (ERRONEOUSLY NAMEED AND SUED HEREIN AS WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD AS TO DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF WILCOX, WENDY ON SEP-20-2013 THROUGH OCT-08-2013 FILED BY DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DBA WEST CONSTRUCTIOIN (ERRONEOUSLY NAMEED AND SUED HEREIN AS WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-13-2014 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED 11/18/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • CASE NOT ASSIGNED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF WILCOX, WENDY ON SEP-20-2013 THROUGH OCT-08-2013 FILED BY DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DBA WEST CONSTRUCTIOIN (ERRONEOUSLY NAMEED AND SUED HEREIN AS WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY WILCOX, WENDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • REVIEW FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-13-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-03-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DBA WEST CONSTRUCTIOIN (ERRONEOUSLY NAMEED AND SUED HEREIN AS WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.) (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DBA WEST CONSTRUCTIOIN (ERRONEOUSLY NAMEED AND SUED HEREIN AS WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DBA WEST CONSTRUCTIOIN (ERRONEOUSLY NAMEED AND SUED HEREIN AS WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.) (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD SERVED FEB-05-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALNEMRI, KHOLOUD AS TO DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less