This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 20:16:57 (UTC).

KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN VS. MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/24/2014 KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0714

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN

DOES 1 TO 20

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 10

MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

ROSENBAUM, NEIL JACOB

Attorney at ROSENBAUM & ASSOCIATES

247 Hartford St., Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94114

OTIS, J MORROW

Attorney at MOSCONE EMBLIDGE & OTIS LLP

220 Montgomery Street, Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-20-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-24-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN

Notice of Change of Firm Name

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 15026062) FILED BY ATTORNEY OTIS, J MORROW

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN AS TO DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-24-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-22-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-01-2014 (Fee:450.00)

Declaration

DECLARATION OF SEAN HANLON (TRANSACTION ID # 15090064) FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

Defendant MXB Battery Operations LP dba The Batterys Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56445321) FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2015
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-20-2015 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 6/1/15. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-11-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK FELICIA GREEN (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-09-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL FILED. JUDGE ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK FELICIA GREEN (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57315855)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15090121) FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY HEARING SET FOR JUN-11-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTIVE DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 15090064) FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF SEAN HANLON (TRANSACTION ID # 15090064) FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15084113) FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 15026062) FILED BY ATTORNEY OTIS, J MORROW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-20-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-24-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56445321) FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN DOES 1 TO 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN SERVED AUG-05-2014, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN AS TO DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-24-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-22-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-01-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0714
Case Title:KEVIN SEMIEN DBA GREENSTAR LAUNDRY AND LINEN VS. MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY ET AL
Court Date:JUN-09-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, June 9, 2015, Line 8, DEFENDANT MXB BATTERY OPERATIONS, LP DBA THE BATTERY 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTOff calendar. Dismissal filed. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =302/EG


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OTIS, J MORROW