Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 13:43:34 (UTC).

KEVIN JOHNSON VS. FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 KEVIN JOHNSON filed an Other lawsuit against FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9180

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, KEVIN , AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC. D/B/A CHAMPS US, A NEW YORK CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, LARRY W.

Attorney at DIVERSITY LAW GROUP, P.C.

515 S. Figueroa St. Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, KEVIN , AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, KEVIN , AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC. D/B/A CHAMPS US, A NEW YORK CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-23-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-22-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-01-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, KEVIN , AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1121126F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, KEVIN , AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC. D/B/A CHAMPS US, A NEW YORK CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-23-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-22-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-01-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foot Locker Retail, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, LARRY W