Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 10:54:40 (UTC).

KEVAN CAVERHILL VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2005 KEVAN CAVERHILL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4047

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVERHILL, KEVAN

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CRANE CO.

TERRY STEAM TURBINE CO

OAKFABCO, INC.

BECHTEL CORPORATION/SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC

DOES 1-8500

VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC EMERSON ENTITY

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS)

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

BURFORD, DREW A

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1333 North California Blvd., Suite 690

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

GOETZ, ANDY J.

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO

310 Golden Shore,, Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-4246

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

MORTL, ANDREW T

Attorney at GLYNN & FINLEY

100 Pringle Ave, Ste 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID & PRIEST LLP

101 Second St. Ste. 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

Attorney at BENNETT SAMUELSEN REYNOLDS & ALLARD

1951 Webster St, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612-2940

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHE B.

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI,LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

EXHIBITS D-H TO DECLARATION OF LEAH G. SHOUGH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT

EXHIBITS D-H TO DECLARATION OF LEAH G. SHOUGH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 14195227) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Defendant Sequoia Ventures Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summa

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 14244994) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. HEARING SET FOR JUN-08-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Sequoia V

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 14244994) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

Defendant Sequoia Ventures Inc.s Separate Statement of Undisputed Mate

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 14244994) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

Declaration of Jane M. Weston in Support of Defendant Sequoia Ventures

DECLARATION OF JANE M. WESTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; EXHIBITS A - D (TRANSACTION ID # 14244994) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFEN

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15008573) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVERHILL, KEVAN

DECLARATION OF GRANT E. WALTERS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO

DECL OF GRANT E. WALTERS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15008573) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVERHILL, KEVAN

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15008573) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVERHILL, KEVAN

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE ON MEMO OF P & A IN OPPOSITION TO SEQUOIA VENTURES'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCS (TRANSACTION ID # 15008573) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVERHILL, KEVAN

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, INC. (Fee:292.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC. (Fee:292.20)

ORDER

ORDER & STIP RE RELEASE OF RECORDS PERTAINING TO KEVAN CAVERHILL FILED BY DEFTS

SUMMONS RETURNED FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVERHILL, KEVAN ON DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-I,C,H,I DOES 1-8500

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS & PHONE NUMBER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 13975230) FILED BY ATTORNEY GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Defendant Plant Insulation Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14212721) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 PROTECTIVE

MOTION IN LIMINE #2 (TRANSACTION ID # 15211882) FILED BY DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ON A STRICT LIABILITY THEORY AGAINST SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENC ON A STRICT LIABILITY THEORY (TRANSACTION ID # 25775514) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 REGARDING WORKERS COMPENSATION AS PLAINTIFFS EXCLUSIVE REMEDY

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 REGARDING WORKERS' COMPENSATION AS PLNTF'S EXCLUSIVE REMEDY(TRANSACTION ID # 25775514) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43697654) AS TO DEFENDANT THE INDUSTRIAL MAINTENANCE ENGINEERING CONTRACTING COMPANY INC., DBA TIMEC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35046256) AS TO DEFENDANT TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27062966) AS TO DEFENDANT BECHTEL CORPORATION/SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26585687) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS) WESTERN FIBERGLAS SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-05-2009 IN DEPT. 306. MATTER HAD FULLY RESOLVED AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN DEPT. 502. THE ONLY REMAINING CASE IN BRAYTON GROUP 416 IS THE MARTIN CASE, #450297. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-23-2009 - BR416 HAS FUTURE DATES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES. (502)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-23-2009 CONTINUED TO AUG-05-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN 306 PURSUANT TO ORDER OF JUDGE ROBERTSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-22-2009 CONTINUED TO JUN-23-2009 AT 10:00 AM IN 502 AS ORDERED BY THE COURT (D-502).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE, MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1-12 (TRANSACTION ID # 25775514) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 REGARDING WORKERS' COMPENSATION AS PLNTF'S EXCLUSIVE REMEDY(TRANSACTION ID # 25775514) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
291 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2005
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC. (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GATKE CORPORATION A BANKRUPT, DEFUNCT, DISSOLVED CORPORATION (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVERHILL, KEVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVERHILL, KEVAN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-I,C,H,I DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-17-2006 (Fee:295.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BECHTEL CORPORATION/SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TERRY STEAM TURBINE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant