Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 15:07:14 (UTC).

KERRY EISENRING et al VS. ALLIED PACKING et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2006 KERRY EISENRING filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALLIED PACKING. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8791

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EISENRING, KERRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF THOMAS EISENRING, DECEASED

Defendants

UNIROYAL, INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

CRANE CO.

BALDOR ELECTRIC COMPANY

RILEY POWER, INC.

VIACOM, INC

CONWED CORP.

AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT, ALTER EGO AND SII TO FAIRBANKS MORSE ENGINES

OAKFABCO, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY AS PARENT, ALTER EGO, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AND AS THE ENTITY FORMERLY KNOWN AS KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

RUSSELL MANUFACTURING COMPANY

WARREN PUMPS INC

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

MASTER PUMPS & EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AS PARENT, ALTER EGO, AND SII TO GARLOCK INC.

DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

77 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCKEOWN, FRANCIS MCCLINTOCK

Attorney at MCKEOWN & ASSOCIATES

2550 Ninth Street, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

CATALDO, LORI A.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD LLP

1333 N California Street, #690

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBON BISGAARD & SMITH

One Sansome St., Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

SHAFFER, BRIAN

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANYS OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE; PROOF OF S

OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE; PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXISNEXIS TRANSMISSION (TRANSACTION ID # 15323940) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY, FKA ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO INC, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVE AS ELLIOTT TURBO MACHINERY CO INC

Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Companys Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Sharon H. Holwerda; Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts; [Proposed] Order

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16799054) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JAN-11-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

Exhibit G to the Declaration of Sharon H. Holwerda in Support of Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Companys Motion for Summary Judgment

EXHIBIT G TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON H. HOLWERDA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16799054) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

EXHIBIT H (pgs 51 - 116) IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF JOSETTE D. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF FOSTER WHEELER LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT H (PGS 51 - 116) IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF JOSETTE D. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF FOSTER WHEELER LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 16797402) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF FLOWSERVE CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16805239) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, IMPROPERLY DENOMINATED HEREIN AS FLOWSERVE US INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BYRON JACKSON AND SIER BATH GEAR AND PUMP COMPANY; FLOWSERVE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT, ALTER EGO AND SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HENRY VOGT MACHINE COMPANY,

EXHIBIT BB-CC TO DECLARATION OF DENISE J. SERRA IN SUPPPORT OF DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT BB-CC TO DECLARATION OF DENISE J. SERRA IN SUPPPORT OF DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 16837395) FILED BY DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, IMPROPERLY SUED AS STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT, ALTER EGO, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AND FKA PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16839881) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JAN-11-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

EXHIBIT F TO THE DECLARATION OF EDWARD P. TUGADE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING OF COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1030

EXHIBIT F TO THE DECLARATION OF EDWARD P. TUGADE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY'S MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING OF COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1030 (TRANSACTION ID # 16936238) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

DECLARATION OF EDWARD P. TUGADE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COOPER CAMERON CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING OF COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P 1030

DECLARATION OF EDWARD P. TUGADE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COOPER CAMERON CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING OF COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P 1030 (TRANSACTION ID # 16940107) FILED BY DEFENDANT COOPER CAMERON, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO COOPER BESSEMER, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.

Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION ON NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND SUPPROTING DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 17582910) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EISENRING, KERRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF THOMAS EISENRING, DECEASED EISENRING, AARON ARNOLD, LINDA

ORDER

ORDER --- STIPULATION AND RODER RE HEARING ON DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL ITS PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL ITS PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 17973466) FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

Plaintiffs Supplemental Separate Statement of Undisputed material Facts in Support of its Opposition to Defendant ITT Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment

SUPPLEMENTAL SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18410164) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EISENRING, KERRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF THOMAS EISENRING, DECEASED EISENRING, AARON ARNOLD, LINDA

ORDER GRANTING FOSTER WHEELER LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN

ORDER GRANTING FOSTER WHEELER LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (UNDISPUTED MATERIAL) IN SUPPORT OF DEFT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20727038) FILED BY DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

Amendment to Complaint changing DOE 12 to SSW, Inc.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21321139) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 12 TO BE SSW, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE PARENT, ALTER EGO, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER AND SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO NATIONAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION AND NEBRASKA BOILER COMPANY

Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to defendant Baldor Electric Company only.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21631859) AS TO DEFENDANT BALDOR ELECTRIC COMPANY

Declaration of K. Chio In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its Former Peerless Pump Business MSJ or MSA Part 9 of 11

DECLARATION OF K. CHIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER PEERLESS PUMP BUSINESS MSJ OR MSA PART 9 OF 11 (TRANSACTION ID # 21715867) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EISENRING, KERRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF THOMAS EISENRING, DECEASED EISENRING, AARON ARNOLD, LINDA

1,318 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2013
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-06-2013. DISMISSAL FILED 5/3/13. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 52104437)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-06-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-06-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, PAULA RASMUSSEN. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • CONTINUED ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-25-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-06-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 46719984) AS TO DEFENDANT UNIROYAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44774960) AS TO DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS CLEAVER-BROOKS, A DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 44697487) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44589508) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44558685) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALTER EGO AND/OR SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GENERAL DYNAMICS CANADA AND ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-31-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-25-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, PAULA RASMUSSEN. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,538 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 12645149) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER PEERLESS PUMP AND NORTHERN PUMP BUSINESSES, IMPROPERLY SUED AS FMC CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT, ALTER EGO, AND SUCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ALLIS CHALMERS AND/OR NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY AND/OR PEERLESS PUMPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12645149) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER PEERLESS PUMP AND NORTHERN PUMP BUSINESSES, IMPROPERLY SUED AS FMC CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENT, ALTER EGO, AND SUCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ALLIS CHALMERS AND/OR NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY AND/OR PEERLESS PUMPS (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12638902) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 12628295) FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12628295) FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12615705) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN STANDARD INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12594808) FILED BY DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12524040) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF EISENRING, KERRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF THOMAS EISENRING, DECEASED EISENRING, AARON ARNOLD, LINDA AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIED PACKING DOES 1 THROUGH 300 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-20-2006 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASTER PUMPS & EQUIPMENT CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONWED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Exxon Mobil Corporation is a litigant