Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:42 (UTC).

KELLY HUDDLESTON et al VS. JOHNSON & JHNSON SERVICES INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 KELLY HUDDLESTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JHNSON SERVICES INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8488

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUDDLESTON, JOYCE

HUDDLESTON, KELLY

Defendants

DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.

JOHNSON & JHNSON

JOHNSON & JHNSON SERVICES INC.

SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS

VAIL CONSULTING LLC

VAIL MD, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KERSHAW WILLIAM A

KERSHAW, WILLIAM A

Attorney at KERSHAW, CUTTER, & RATINOFF LLP

401 Watt Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95864

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED NOITCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR INFO PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-14-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JHNSON

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE AS TO DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JHNSON SERVICES INC. JOHNSON & JHNSON DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. VAIL CONSULTING LLC VAIL MD, THOMAS SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP #4649. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED ADR INFO. PACKAGE, NOITCE OF RELATED CASE, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-11-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-19-2013 ON DEFENDANT SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED ADR INFO PACKAGE, NOTICE OF RELATED CASE, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-11-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-13-2013 ON DEFENDANT VAIL MD, THOMAS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE JCCP NO 4649

ORDER COORDINATING CASE WITH 4649

ORDER COORDINATING CASE WITH 4649

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JHNSON SERVICES INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED ADR INFO PACKAGE, NOTICE OF RELATED CASE, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-11-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-13-2013 ON DEFENDANT VAIL CONSULTING LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP #4649. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER COORDINATING CASE WITH 4649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED ADR INFO PACKAGE, NOTICE OF RELATED CASE, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-11-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-13-2013 ON DEFENDANT VAIL MD, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED ADR INFO PACKAGE, NOTICE OF RELATED CASE, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-11-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-13-2013 ON DEFENDANT VAIL CONSULTING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED NOITCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR INFO PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-14-2013, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE ON DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED ADR INFO. PACKAGE, NOITCE OF RELATED CASE, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-11-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-19-2013 ON DEFENDANT SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JHNSON SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE JCCP NO 4649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUDDLESTON, KELLY HUDDLESTON, JOYCE AS TO DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JHNSON SERVICES INC. JOHNSON & JHNSON DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. VAIL CONSULTING LLC VAIL MD, THOMAS SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less