This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 18:09:30 (UTC).

KELLY ELLIS ET AL VS. GOOGLE, INC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 KELLY ELLIS filed an Other lawsuit against GOOGLE, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDREW Y. S. CHENG, SAMUEL K. FENG, ANDREW Y.S. CHENG, MARY E. WISS, GARRETT L. WONG and TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1299

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

GARRETT L. WONG

SAMUEL K. FENG

ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

TERI L. JACKSON

MARY E. WISS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

GOOGLE, INC

GOOGLE, LLC (FORMERLY GOOGLE, INC.)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DERMODY, KELLY M

Attorney at LIEFF, CABRASER, HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN, LLP

275 Battery, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941113339

FINBERG, JAMES MICHAEL

Attorney at ALTSHULER BERZON LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

HUTTON, ZACHARY P

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

101 California Street, 48Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

WILLNER, KENNETH M.

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

2050 M Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

DAVIS, FELICIA A.

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

515 South Flower Street, Twenty-Fifth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BROWN, BARBARA B.

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

875 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-14-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-13-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-22-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

ORDER

ORDER - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67721793)

Volume III of Exhibits to the Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Suppo

VOLUME III OF EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Volume II of Exhibits to the Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Suppor

VOLUME II OF EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Declaration of James M. Finberg in Support Of Plaintiffs? Unopposed Mo

DECLARATION OF JAMES M. FINBERG IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Support of Plaintiffs? Unopposed Mo

DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT; VOLUME I OF III OF EXHIBITS (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs? Unoppos

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Clas

NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED HEARING SET FOR JUN-21-2022 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 613

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY KENNETH M. WILLNER TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JUL-27-2022

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67700366) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

ORDER

ORDER & STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID #67607525)

ORDER

ORDER AFTER REVIEW OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION (EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY) (TRANSACTION 67460453)

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 67453289) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Joint Case Management Statement

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS (TRANSACTION ID # 67453289) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

ORDER

ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #67209849)

MINUTES FOR JAN-04-2022 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR JAN-04-2022 9:00 AM

Joint Case Management Statement

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT WITH DEFENDANT (TRANSACTION ID # 67198113) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

236 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): Trial; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY BARBARA B. BROWN; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE PAID FOR ATTORNEY KENNETH M. WILLNER; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): Notice Of Motion And Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action And Paga Settlement; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67721793)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialPayment: MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W0622613M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUME III OF EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUME II OF EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF KELLY M. DERMODY IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JAMES M. FINBERG IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND PAGA SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67716571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED LAMAR, HEIDI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
442 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 61189222) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC; Fee: $1450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLEX LITIGATION, DEPT. 305, PER ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FILED 10/2/17, AN INITIA,L CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR OCT-26-2017 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 305. THE FEB-14-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN DEPT. 610 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. (305/MEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX DESIGNATION; SINGLY ASSIGNING CASE; AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61133886), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED SEP-15-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FinancialPayment: MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: CASH; Receipt Number: W0817914M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED; Fee: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $1000; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W0817914F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W0817914F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELLIS, KELLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PEASE, HOLLY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED WISURI, KELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-14-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-13-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-22-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE; Fee: $1450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS FELICIA ANNE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hutton, Zachary Perry