This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:22 (UTC).

KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. VS. HENRY C. LO et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENRY C LO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8441

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

Defendants

HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

LO, HENRY C.

DOES 1 TO 5

Assignee

KELSTIN GROUP, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorneys

DUREE TERRY A

DUREE, TERRY ALAN

Attorney at TERRY A. DUREE, INC.

622 Jackson St

Fairfield, CA 94533

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $163.81 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,408.98 INTEREST, $300.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 56823351) FILED BY ASSIGNEE KELSTIN GROUP, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

DECLARATION

DECLARATION BY KATHRYN A. PARSONS, PRESIDENT, KELKRIS ASSOCIATES INC. IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK UNDER CCP 585 (D) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

Assignment of Judgment

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56823351) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO ASSIGNEE KELSTIN GROUP, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO $6,312.15 PRINCIPAL, $800.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $1,120.41 INTEREST, $320.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $8,552.56, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $320.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

COST BILL

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $791.22 INTEREST, $120.00 COSTS, M/D = 5/30/14 FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 57816100) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

Failure to Appear for Order of Examination

ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT HENRY C. LO, JEAN LOUISE HOUSTON, DOES 1 TO 5 MAR-06-2014, NO APPEARANCE, CONTINUED TO APR-22-2014 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR LETTER. PHIL KILDUFF, ESQ., SPECIALLY APPEARING FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR. NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES SERVED MAR-20-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT ISSUED, BAIL SET AT $500.00,

WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT ISSUED, BAIL SET AT $500.00, AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C.

WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT RETURNED //AGREEMENT TO APPEAR

WARRANT OF ATTACHMENT RETURNED //AGREEMENT TO APPEAR AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. OEX HEARING SET FOR OCT-02-2014 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF BENCH WARRANT CITED TO 10/2 AT 1400, DEPT 514 AT 400 MCALLISTER ST. FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES SERVED SEP-15-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL RE LETTER TO VACATE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $707.40 AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO DOES 1 TO 5 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION FOR COSTS UNDER CCP 1033 (B) (2) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. OEX HEARING SET FOR MAR-06-2014 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 57816100) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $707.40 AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SOLANO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $163.81 AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $163.81 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,408.98 INTEREST, $300.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 56823351) FILED BY ASSIGNEE KELSTIN GROUP, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56823351) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO ASSIGNEE KELSTIN GROUP, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION DEC-02-2014 DISCHARGED WITHOUT COSTS PER LOCAL RULE 8. 9 (E)AS TO HENRY C. LO. NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR. HENRY C. LO APPEARING ON HIS OWN BEHALF. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPOTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL RE LETTER TO VACATE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT HENRY C. LO, ON OCT-02-2014 CONTINUED TO DEC-02-2014 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR FURTHER EXAMINATION. PHILIP T. KILDUFF, ESQ., SPECIALLY APPEARING FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR. JUDGMENT DEBTOR HENRY C. LO, APPEARING ON HIS OWN BEHALF. JUDGMENT DEBTOR HENRY C. LO SWORN AND EXAMINED. JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO PRODUCE FURTHER DOCUMENTATION PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF BENCH WARRANT CITED TO 10/2 AT 1400, DEPT 514 AT 400 MCALLISTER ST. FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES SERVED SEP-15-2014, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR COSTS UNDER CCP 1033 (B) (2) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $320.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES SERVED MAR-20-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES SERVED MAR-20-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC. DBA CREDIT BUREAU ASSOCIATES AS TO DEFENDANT LO, HENRY C. HOUSTON, JEAN LOUISE AKA JEAN LO DOES 1 TO 5 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less