This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 01:05:43 (UTC).

KEIKO FUJIMOTO VS. RAMESH BALWANI

Case Summary

On 02/14/2002 KEIKO FUJIMOTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMESH BALWANI. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0274

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2002

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FUJIMOTO, KEIKO

Respondent

BALWANI, RAMESH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

02/25/2022

DocketCOPYING FEES (4 PAGE); Fee: $2.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2002

DocketJUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS DEC-31-2002

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2002

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2002

DocketFAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECK LIST 1, DECL FOR DEFAULT, (2) PRELIMINARY DECL OF DISCLOSURE, PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2002

DocketSUMMONS FILED & ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2002

DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER FUJIMOTO, KEIKO AS TO RESPONDENT BALWANI, RAMESH; Fee: $206.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less