This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 01:05:23 (UTC).

KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL VS. BUFFALO CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL filed an Other lawsuit against BUFFALO CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4219

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL

Defendants

BUFFALO CORPORATION

DOES 1-30, INCLUSIVE

THE HOME DEPOT

THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GATES, KIMBERLY

Defendant Attorneys

LOVE, MARK A

YANG, EVA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68993992) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL AS TO DEFENDANT BUFFALO CORPORATION THE HOME DEPOT DOES 1-30, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-28-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-27-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-05-2023

Civil case coversheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68993992) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68993992) TO PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL

Proof of Service as to Buffalo

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69287868), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL SERVED FEB-06-2023, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT BUFFALO CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons as to Home Depot

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69287868), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL SERVED FEB-06-2023, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT

DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.???S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF???S COMP

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210031172) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

DEFENDANT BUFFALO CORPORATION?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR CI

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69730307) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO CORPORATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210038021) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210038021) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: Y0223404F007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69730307) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO CORPORATION; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W2223319F003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210031172) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69287868), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL SERVED FEB-06-2023, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT THE HOME DEPOT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69287868), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL SERVED FEB-06-2023, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT BUFFALO CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68993992) TO PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H4823126F031

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68993992) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68993992) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEEP AMERICA SAFE AND BEAUTIFUL AS TO DEFENDANT BUFFALO CORPORATION THE HOME DEPOT DOES 1-30, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-28-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-27-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-05-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less