This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/08/2020 at 15:33:44 (UTC).

KATHRYN KELSON VS. MK FIN LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 KATHRYN KELSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MK FIN LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6168

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELSON, KATHRYN

Defendants

PRATHER, JEFF AND INDIVIDUAL

MK FIN LLC

EMERALD FINANCIAL CORPORATION

LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

LENDERS T.D. SERVICES INC.

WEDGEWOOD LLC AKA CATAMOUNT PROPERTIES

PHUNG, DAI AN INDIVIDUAL

KELSO, MICHAEL GAVIND AS AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TALWAR, DEEPA

Attorney at LEGACY LAW GROUP, APC

4695 Macarthur Court, Suite #1100

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELSON, KATHRYN AS TO DEFENDANT MK FIN LLC LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY LENDERS T.D. SERVICES INC. PRATHER, JEFF AND INDIVIDUAL PHUNG, DAI AN INDIVIDUAL EMERALD FINANCIAL CORPORATION KELSO, MICHAEL GAVIND AS AN INDIVIDUAL WEDGEWOOD LLC AKA CATAMOUNT PROPERTIES DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-20-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-16-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-28-2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1320825F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELSON, KATHRYN AS TO DEFENDANT MK FIN LLC LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY LENDERS T.D. SERVICES INC. PRATHER, JEFF AND INDIVIDUAL PHUNG, DAI AN INDIVIDUAL EMERALD FINANCIAL CORPORATION KELSO, MICHAEL GAVIND AS AN INDIVIDUAL WEDGEWOOD LLC AKA CATAMOUNT PROPERTIES DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-20-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-16-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-28-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6168
Case Title:KATHRYN KELSON VS. MK FIN LLC ET AL
Court Date:MAY-03-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Be Relieve
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for May 3, 2021 line 2.PLAINTIFF KATHRYN KELSON Notice Of Motion And Motion To Be Relieveis OFF CALENDAR. Insufficient notice per CCP 1005 and 1013. =(501/REQ)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERALD FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases where LENDERS T. D. SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WEDGEWOOD LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY is a litigant