This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/02/2019 at 11:50:16 (UTC).

KATHLEEN MASCHAL ET AL VS. PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 a Other - Complex Tort/Class Action case was filed by KATHLEEN MASCHAL against PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4230

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDERSON, JACKLYNN

GOUTIEEREZ, JACE BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JACKLYNN ANDERSON

MASCHAL, KATHLEEN

Defendants

PG&E CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PG&E CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PG&E CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100062038) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 100062038) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP 4955. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PETITION OF APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JACKLYNN ANDERSON APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JACE GOUTIEREZ) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDERSON, JACKLYNN

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100035834) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Notice of Entry of Coordination Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100035834) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100033321) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Notice of Submission for Coordination

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION FOR COORDINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100033321) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF MASCHAL, KATHLEEN ANDERSON, JACKLYNN GOUTIEEREZ, JACE BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JACKLYNN ANDERSON

Notice of Related Case

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 61712468) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MASCHAL, KATHLEEN ANDERSON, JACKLYNN GOUTIEEREZ, JACE BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JACKLYNN ANDERSON

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

MASS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MASCHAL, KATHLEEN ANDERSON, JACKLYNN GOUTIEEREZ, JACE BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JACKLYNN ANDERSON AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION PG&E CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-10-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $2900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1718321F017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R7818228C001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018209F022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100062038) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 100062038) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP 4955. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JACKLYNN ANDERSON APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JACE GOUTIEREZ) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANDERSON, JACKLYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100035834) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100035834) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100033321) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SUBMISSION FOR COORDINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100033321) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:$2900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF MASCHAL, KATHLEEN ANDERSON, JACKLYNN GOUTIEEREZ, JACE BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JACKLYNN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 61712468) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MASCHAL, KATHLEEN ANDERSON, JACKLYNN GOUTIEEREZ, JACE BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JACKLYNN ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • FEE PAID FOR EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM / MINOR (TRANSACTION ID # 61710561) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MASCHAL, KATHLEEN ANDERSON, JACKLYNN GOUTIEEREZ, JACE BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JACKLYNN ANDERSON (Fee:$20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MASS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MASCHAL, KATHLEEN ANDERSON, JACKLYNN GOUTIEEREZ, JACE BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JACKLYNN ANDERSON AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION PG&E CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-10-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less