This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/15/2016 at 16:07:43 (UTC).

KATHI SEGALAS VS. FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/25/2015 KATHI SEGALAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4938

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEGALAS, KATHI

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCQUAID, MOIRA C

Attorney at MOIRA C MCQUAIDQ

177 Bovet Road Suite 600

San Mateo, CA 94402

Defendant Attorney

O'CONNOR, EMILY E.

333 Bush Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI AS TO DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-26-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-26-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-03-2015 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15095139), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI SERVED MAR-31-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT [DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE ATTACHED THERETO] (TRANSACTION ID # 15095142), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI SERVED MAR-31-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57378951) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION REFERRING CASE TO BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-26-2015 CONTINUED TO FEB-24-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC.S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58496528) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58496528) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Plaintiff Kathi Segalas Case Management Statement for Arbitration Stay

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58513270) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Proof of Electronic Service on 2-2-16 of Plaintiff Kathi Segalas Case

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 2-2-16 OF PLAINTIFF KATHI SEGALAS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ON DEFENDANT FIBROGEN, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 58513270) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI

Proof of Service by Mail on 1-29-16 of Plaintiff Kathi Segalas Case Ma

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON 1-29-16 OF PLAINTIFF KATHI SEGALAS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ON DEFENDANT LAURA SMITH (TRANSACTION ID # 58513270) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-24-2016 CONTINUED TO AUG-24-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58659827) FILED BY ATTORNEY O'CONNOR, EMILY E.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58659827) FILED BY ATTORNEY O'CONNOR, EMILY E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-24-2016 CONTINUED TO AUG-24-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON 1-29-16 OF PLAINTIFF KATHI SEGALAS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ON DEFENDANT LAURA SMITH (TRANSACTION ID # 58513270) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 2-2-16 OF PLAINTIFF KATHI SEGALAS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ON DEFENDANT FIBROGEN, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 58513270) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58513270) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58496528) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58496528) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-26-2015 CONTINUED TO FEB-24-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION REFERRING CASE TO BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • FEE PAID ON STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO BINDING CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND STAYING ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 57422534) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57378951) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • FEE PD JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (TRANSACTION ID # 57378951) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • FEE PAID ON JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (TRANSACTION ID # 57287370) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT [DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE ATTACHED THERETO] (TRANSACTION ID # 15095142), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI SERVED MAR-31-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15095139), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI SERVED MAR-31-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGALAS, KATHI AS TO DEFENDANT FIBROGEN INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION SMITH, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-26-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-26-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-03-2015 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FibroGen, Inc. is a litigant