Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 22:40:13 (UTC).

KARIN GREIER VS. PHILIP SODERQUIST et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2009 KARIN GREIER filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against PHILIP SODERQUIST. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2818

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVOVICH & VOLCHEGURSKY, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #500481)

LVOVICH & VOLCHEGURSKY, LLP

GREIER, KARIN

San Francisco, CA 94115

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

LVOVICH & VOLCHEGURSKY, LLP

PETERS, HANNAH

GREIER, KARIN (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #500481)

2999 California Street #76

San Francisco, CA 94115

LVOVICH, MILLA

VLOVICH, MILLA

VLOVICH & VOLCHEGURSKY LLP

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GREIER, KARIN (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #500481)

2999 California Street #76

San Francisco, CA 94115

ROES 1-5

Others

SODERQUIST,, PHILIP (PARTY FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #500481)

SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES (PARTY FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #500481)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LVOVICH, MILLA L.

Attorney at LVOVICH, VOLCHEGURSKY & SZUCSKO, LLP

425 California St, Ste 550

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROECA, RUSSELL SAMUEL

Attorney at ROECA HAAS HAGER LLP

351 California St., Suite 900

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROBINSON, RUSSELL A

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RUSSELL A. ROBINSON

345 Grove Street, Level One

San Francisco, CA 94102

KELLY, DENNIS J

Attorney at DILLINGHAM & MURPHY, LLP

225 Bush Street,, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-0000

MAO, HSIAO C

Attorney at KAUFMAN DOLOWICH & VOLUCK, LLP

425 California St, Ste 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Other Attorneys

KELLY, DENNIS J

Attorney at DILLINGHAM & MURPHY, LLP

225 Bush Street,, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-0000

MAO, HSIAO C

Attorney at KAUFMAN DOLOWICH & VOLUCK, LLP

425 California St, Ste 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREIER, KARIN AS TO DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES VLOVICH, MILLA PETERS, HANNAH VLOVICH & VOLCHEGURSKY LLP DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-26-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-23-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-11-2010 (Fee:370.00)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR JAN-19-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREIER, KARIN SERVED SEP-22-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREIER, KARIN SERVED SEP-22-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LVOVICH & VOLCHEGURSKY, LLP

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-10-2011 CONTINUED TO APR-15-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610, FOR PARTIES TO COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-31-2011 CONTINUED TO JUL-18-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT; TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT. THE MAY-31-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-02-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-30-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEP-24-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REPLY

REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT TO ONE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES FILED BY DEFENDANT PETERS, HANNAH LVOVICH, MILLA

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NON-OPPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE FILED BY DEFENDANT PETERS, HANNAH LVOVICH, MILLA LVOVICH & VOLCHEGURSKY, LLP

Case Ordered Off Calendar

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-25-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF KAREN GREIER

PROOF OF SERVICE GRANTING ATTORNEY MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR ROBINSON, RUSSELL A AS ATTORNEY FOR GREIER, KARIN

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE AGAINST PLTF KARIEN GREIER FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES HEARING SET FOR SEP-24-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REOPEN DISCOVERY; MEMO P/A FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH J. DE HOPE JR. IN SUPP OF REPLY TO OPPOIS TO MTN TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SEPCIAL INTEROGGS SET 3 FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CAUSES OF ACTION OF COMPLAINT AS TO PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE AND BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS ONLY

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-10-500481 WITH CASE CGC-09-492818; ALL FURTHER ENTRIES UNDER CASE CGC-09-492818

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN APRT KARIN GRIER'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REOPEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-26-2012 VACATED, AFTER BEING PUT ON TELEPHONE STANDBY. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 11/30/12. CASE DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY PER PHONE CALL FROM COUNSEL MARK MAO. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY SODERQUIST, PHILIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • DECLARATION OF HSIAO C MAO IN SUPPORT OF PHILLIP SODEUIST'S OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1 THROUGH 6 FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 5 FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 4 FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3 FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 6 FILED BY DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP DBA SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2010
  • DECLARATION RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREIER, KARIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREIER, KARIN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-07-2010 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE APR-23-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-26-2010 CONTINUED TO APR-23-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREIER, KARIN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON JAN-19-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • DECLARATION RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREIER, KARIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR JAN-19-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREIER, KARIN AS TO DEFENDANT SODERQUIST, PHILIP SODERQUIST LAW OFFICES VLOVICH, MILLA PETERS, HANNAH VLOVICH & VOLCHEGURSKY LLP DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-26-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-23-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-11-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBINSON, RUSSELL A