This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 06:49:07 (UTC).

KAREN HADEN VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS

Case Summary

On 04/28/2004 KAREN HADEN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, PATRICK J. MAHONEY, ROBERT L. DONDERO, RICHARD A. KRAMER, DAVID BALLATI, MARY E. WISS, WALLACE P. DOUGLASS, TOMAR MASON, JAMES L. WARREN, EVERETT HEWLETT and DONNA J. HITCHENS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0933

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

PATRICK J. MAHONEY

ROBERT L. DONDERO

RICHARD A. KRAMER

DAVID BALLATI

MARY E. WISS

WALLACE P. DOUGLASS

TOMAR MASON

JAMES L. WARREN

EVERETT HEWLETT

DONNA J. HITCHENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARRET II, CHARLES AS LEGAL HEIRS OF ZELLA GARRET, DECEASED

HADEN, KAREN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ZELLA GARRET, DECEASED

ROMERO, THOMAS

ROMERO, PHILIP

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

GATKE CORPORATION, A BANKRUPT, DEFUNCT, DISSOLVED CORPORATION

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION

GENUINE PARTS CO. (GPC)

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

CSK AUTO, INC.

RAY'S AUTO PARTS

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS

DANA CORPORATION

MACK TRUCKS, INC.

CATERPILLAR INC.

BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTHE AMERICAN TIRE,LLC, SUCCESSOR TO BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE,INC.

Other

DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Roadp.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 949486169

Defendant Attorneys

BROWN, EUGENE

Attorney at FILICE, BROWN, EASSA & MCLEOD, LLP

1999 Harrison St. 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

Attorney at BENNETT SAMUELSEN REYNOLDS & ALLARD

1951 Webster Stsuite 200

Oakland, CA 946122940

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at BISHOP, BARRY, HOWE, HANEY & RYDER

2000 Powell Streetsuite 1425

Emeryville, CA 94608

MARTINI, STEVEN DOMINIC

Attorney at BASSI MARTINI & BLUM

351 California St Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

TOWLE, EDMUND J

Attorney at TOWLE DENISON SMITH & TAVERA LLP

10866 Wilshire Blvdsuite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90024

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

100 Pringle Ave. Ste. 750

Walnut Creek, CA 945960000

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

One Market Plazaspear Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street2Oth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID & PRIEST LLP

101 Second St. Ste. 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

WASSERMAN, STEVEN DAVID

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETER, MORAN &. ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plazastuart Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St.Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

Other Attorney

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 946103614

Other Attorneys

RYAN, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI,EDLIN & BLUM,LLP.

351 California Streetsuite 200

San Franacisco, CA 94104

WALLACE, JOHN ROBERT

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE

55 Francisco Street6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

ENGEL, ROBERT G.

Attorney at STEVENS, DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd. Ste 250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

TORRES, JULIE ANN

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco St. 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Streetsuite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

180 Townsend Street3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94107

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

550 Montgomery Streeteighth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE [SEE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A] (TRANSACTION ID # 29131944)

ORDER

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DISMISSALS (FILED IN CASE NO. CGC-82-828684) IN THE CASES ATTACHED IN EXHIBIT A

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HADEN, KAREN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ZELLA GARRET, DECEASED ROMERO, THOMAS ROMERO, PHILIP GARRET, DANIEL GARRET II, CHARLES AS LEGAL HEIRS OF ZELLA GARRET, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-21-2005 (Fee:292.50)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER L.L.C. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MACK TRUCKS, INC. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR INC. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTHE AMERICAN TIRE,LLC, SUCCESSOR TO BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE,INC. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC., (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PACCAR INC. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER VENTURES LLC (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GATKE CORPORATION, A BANKRUPT, DEFUNCT, DISSOLVED CORPORATION (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY (Fee:289.20)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DISMISSALS (FILED IN CASE NO. CGC-82-828684) IN THE CASES ATTACHED IN EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE [SEE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A] (TRANSACTION ID # 29131944)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15437347) AS TO DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS CO. (GPC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14170415) AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13532263) AS TO DEFENDANT PACCAR INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR ON NOV-27-2006 IN DEPT. 503 - CASE SETTLED. NOT REPORTED. (D503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • DocketASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-22-2006, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. CONTINUED TO NOV-27-2006 AT 9:30 AM IN 503. NOT REPORTED. (D503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL Off Calendar Nov-27-2006 Text Ruling; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2006
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL Off Calendar Nov-27-2006 Continued To Nov-27-06 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • DocketASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-17-2006, MOTIONS IN LIMINE WERE HEARD AND RULED ON. CONTINUED TO NOV-22-2006 AT 9:30 AM IN 503. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II; GENA EALES, CSR 176 ; CLERK: C.LI

    Read MoreRead Less
212 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2004
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER L.L.C. AS TO PLAINTIFF HADEN, KAREN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ZELLA GARRET, DECEASED ROMERO, THOMAS ROMERO, PHILIP GARRET, DANIEL GARRET II, CHARLES AS LEGAL HEIRS OF ZELLA GARRET, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER L.L.C. (Fee:$289.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2004
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $289.2; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1404720F036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:$289.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2004
  • DocketDEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE LENGTH OF TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2004
  • DocketOBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2004
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-21-2005 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-16-2005 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206 PURSUANT TO "BIG MOVE LIST"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $292.5; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1004428F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HADEN, KAREN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ZELLA GARRET, DECEASED ROMERO, THOMAS ROMERO, PHILIP GARRET, DANIEL GARRET II, CHARLES AS LEGAL HEIRS OF ZELLA GARRET, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-21-2005 (Fee:$292.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GATKE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THORPE INSULATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC is a litigant