This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/12/2019 at 13:19:02 (UTC).

KAMIAR FARIBA ET AL VS. DENISE L. PAULSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 a Contract - Business case was filed by KAMIAR FARIBA against DENISE L PAULSON in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4313

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL

FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1-10

PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL

ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100077083)

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040964) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED MAR-05-2018, SERVED FEB-15-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 100033241) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL

Declaration of John W. Bassett In Support of Stipulation and Order To

DECLARATION OF JOHN W. BASSETT IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 100065617) (TRANSACTION ID # 100065617) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR APR-22-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED MAR-05-2018, SERVED FEB-15-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 100033241) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100041234) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Ex Parte Application Pursuant To Stipulation and Order To Continue Tri

EX PARTE APPLICATION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 100065617) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040841) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

General Denial

GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100034885) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC.

COMPLAINT

BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100065617) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2019312E014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : Y0118706J006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5218411F013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1518214F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100077083)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR APR-22-2019 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR COURT ON DEC-09-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN 206 PER EX PARTE ORDER FILED ON 3/13/19. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100065617) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOHN W. BASSETT IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 100065617) (TRANSACTION ID # 100065617) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 100065617) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR APR-22-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100041234) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040964) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100040963) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040841) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100034885) FILED BY DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED MAR-05-2018, SERVED FEB-15-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 100033241) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED MAR-05-2018, SERVED FEB-15-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 100033241) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FARIBA, KAMIAR , AN INDIVIDUAL FARIBA, MARJAN , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT PAULSON, DENISE L. , AN INDIVIDUAL ALAIN PINEL REALTORS, INC. , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.