This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:52:04 (UTC).

KAISER KASABIAN et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2007 KAISER KASABIAN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4460

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KASABIAN, BEN AS LEGAL HEIR OF KAISER KASABIAN, DECEASED

Defendants

PLANT INSULATION CO.

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

KARI RASMUSSEN

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY

RAPID-AMIERCAN CORPORATION

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

MAREMONT CORPORATION

GATKE CORPORATION

AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION

H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

275 Battery St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BRAINICH, MARC

Attorney at SEDGWICK DETERT MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 W. 5Th Street #700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

WOO, RHONDA L

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

BERRY, PHILLIP SAMUEL

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue, P.O. Box 16070

Oakland, CA 94610

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM HENRY

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & ASSOCIATES, LLP

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 625

Oakland, CA 94612

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

Attorney at BENNETT SAMUELSEN REYNOLDS & ALLARD

1951 Webster St, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612-2940

BERTRAND, JEAN LYNNE

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Def. CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, erroneously sued herein as CUMMINS, INC.s Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury-Asbestos.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17862867) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

3. SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT IN SUPPORT OF THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 19810979) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC.?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 19928538) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT IN SUPPORT OF RHI HOLDINGS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 19954000) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHI HOLDINGS, INC.

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND ADDING CASE TO THE AUGUST 21, 2008 STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF OST TO NOTICE MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND ADDING CASE TO THE AUGUST 21, 2008 STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 20425720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASABIAN, KAISER KASIBIAN, ARDYS

Exhibit D

EXHIBIT D (TRANSACTION ID # 21378586) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CO.

Exhibit E

EXHIBIT E (TRANSACTION ID # 21378586) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CO.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT ARDYS KASABIAN AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO, AND SUBSTITUTE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR, DECEASED PLAINTIFF AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 24046616) IN SUPP OF MO TO APPOINT ARDYS KASABIAN AS SII TO AND SUBSTITUTE SII FOR, DECEASED PLTF AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASABIAN, KAISER KASIBIAN, ARDYS

5) Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Witnesses From The Courtroom

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM (TRANSACTION ID # 35545796) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

Def. CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, erroneously sued herein as CUMMINS, INC.s Demand for Trial by Jury and Estimate of Length of Time.

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 17862867) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

Defendant Plant Insulation Companys Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18690732) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CO. (Fee:335.00)

1. NOTICE OF DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 19810979) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY HEARING SET FOR MAY-28-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:200.00)

DECLARATION OF BARRY N. ENDICK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED

DECLARATION OF BARRY N. ENDICK IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED (TRANSACTION ID # 19928538) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC.

PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE; SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEFS; OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE OR BRIEFS

PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE; SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEFS; OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE OR BRIEFS (TRANSACTION ID # 20161850) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASABIAN, KAISER KASIBIAN, ARDYS

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF KASABIAN, ARDYS AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO KAISER KASABIAN, DECEASED KASABIAN, CURTIS AS LEGAL HEIR OF KAISER KASABIAN, DECEASED KASABIAN, BEN AS LEGAL HEIR OF KAISER KASABIAN, DECEASED

ANSWER OF DANA COMPANIES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH-ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25771817) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC (Fee:365.00)

12) Declaration of Vandad Khosravirad in support of Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd.?s Motion in Limine to Preclude the Admission of the Deposition of Robert Bockstahler

DECLARATION OF VANDAD KHOSRAVIRAD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE ADMISSION OF THE DEPOSITION OF ROBERT BOCKSTAHLER (TRANSACTION ID # 35545796) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

EXHIBIT A-C to Declaration of Vandad Khosravirad in support of Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd.?s Motion in Limine to Preclude the Admission of the Deposition of Robert Bockstahler

EXHIBIT A-C TO DECLARATION OF VANDAD KHOSRAVIRAD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE ADMISSION OF THE DEPOSITION OF ROBERT BOCKSTAHLER (TRANSACTION ID # 35545796) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

284 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2015
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-18-2015, DISMISSAL ON FILE. ANDREW CHEW APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (877)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57270245)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO JUN-09-2016 (TOLLED 5-YEAR DATE FOR DEFENDANT RPI COMPANY, CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASABIAN, ARDYS AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO KAISER KASABIAN, DECEASED KASABIAN, CURTIS AS LEGAL HEIR OF KAISER KASABIAN, DECEASED KASABIAN, SUSAN AS LEGAL HEIR OF KAISER KASABIAN, DECEASED KASABIAN, BEN AS LEGAL HEIR OF KAISER KASABIAN, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-11-2014 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-18-2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: TARA WILLIAMS, CSR#13428 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • ADVANCED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-18-2014 TO DEC-11-2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-18-2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSONE; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ATTORNEY JAMES NEVIN. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-04-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON, CLERK: D. LOK, MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49277913) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 48573221) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
356 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 17979790) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17979790) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17931285) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17923515) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF. CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS CUMMINS, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 17862867) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 17862867) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17862867) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASABIAN, KAISER KASIBIAN, ARDYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASABIAN, KAISER KASIBIAN, ARDYS AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-I,C,H, I ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS-SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less