This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/14/2022 at 16:30:41 (UTC).

JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER (RET.), VS. PG&E CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER RET , filed an Other lawsuit against PG E CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0296

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER (RET.), TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST

Defendants

ENDURANCE RISK SOLUTIONS ASSURANCE COMPANY

GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE (UK) SE

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY

ENERGY INSURANCE MUTUAL LIMITED

ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY

BARBICAN MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL REINSURANCE COMPANY, LTD.

HOUSTON CASUALTY COMPANY

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.

DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

PG&E CORPORATION

TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY

ASSOCIATED ELECTRIC & GAS INURANCE SERVIES LIMITED

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PITRE, FRANK MARIO

Defendant Attorney

MASUDA, GAVIN MITCHEL

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER (RET.), TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY ASSOCIATED ELECTRIC & GAS INURANCE SERVIES LIMITED NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE (UK) SE ENDURANCE RISK SOLUTIONS ASSURANCE COMPANY BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL REINSURANCE COMPANY, LTD. ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY BARBICAN MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY HOUSTON CASUALTY COMPANY DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE ENERGY INSURANCE MUTUAL LIMITED NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-18-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-17-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-26-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

NOTICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER (RET.), TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER (RET.), TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST

Defendants PG and E Corporation and Pacific Gas And Electric Company?s

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL (TRANSACTION ID # 66462333) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66462333) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-18-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

08/18/2021

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jul-30-2021 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-18-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $2900; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2321408F007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66462333) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL / NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL (TRANSACTION ID # 66462333) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY; Fee: $2900.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER (RET.), TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $1000; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1121319F007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1121319F006

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER (RET.), TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUSTICE JOHN TROTTER (RET.), TRUSTEE OF THE PG&E FIRE VICTIM TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY ASSOCIATED ELECTRIC & GAS INURANCE SERVIES LIMITED NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE (UK) SE ENDURANCE RISK SOLUTIONS ASSURANCE COMPANY BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL REINSURANCE COMPANY, LTD. ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY BARBICAN MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY HOUSTON CASUALTY COMPANY DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE ENERGY INSURANCE MUTUAL LIMITED NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-18-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-17-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-26-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE; Fee: $1450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less