Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:52:52 (UTC).

JUNGREIS LAW VS. AKSHAY DAVE et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 JUNGREIS LAW filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against AKSHAY DAVE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3079

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAW, JUNGREIS

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendants

PATEL, MUKESH AKA " MIKE PATEL "

Fremont, CA 94538

DAVE, AKSHAY A.K.A. ART DAVE

Cupertino, CA 95014

DAVE, MOHINI

Cupertino, CA 95014

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-15-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT DAVE, AKSHAY A.K.A. ART DAVE

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $7,200.00 FILED BY LAW, JUNGREIS AS TO DEFENDANT DAVE, AKSHAY A.K.A. ART DAVE PATEL, MUKESH AKA " MIKE PATEL " DAVE, MOHINI ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-15-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

Small Claims Order of Dismissal of Entire Action L.R. 18.0

THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-15-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT DAVE, MOHINI

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFENDANT MUKESH (MIKE)PATEL, REQUESTING A DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • NOTICE OF VENUE CHALLENGE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • CHALLENGE TO VENUE FILED BY DEFENDANT PATEL, MUKESH AKA " MIKE PATEL "

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-15-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT DAVE, MOHINI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-15-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT DAVE, AKSHAY A.K.A. ART DAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-08-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT PATEL, MUKESH AKA " MIKE PATEL "

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAW, JUNGREIS AS TO DEFENDANT PATEL, MUKESH AKA " MIKE PATEL " (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAW, JUNGREIS AS TO DEFENDANT DAVE, MOHINI (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAW, JUNGREIS AS TO DEFENDANT DAVE, AKSHAY A.K.A. ART DAVE (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $7,200.00 FILED BY LAW, JUNGREIS AS TO DEFENDANT DAVE, AKSHAY A.K.A. ART DAVE PATEL, MUKESH AKA " MIKE PATEL " DAVE, MOHINI ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-15-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

    Read MoreRead Less