This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 20:59:02 (UTC).

JULIO CEZAR BARRAGAN VS. PHILIPPE DOHERTY ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 JULIO CEZAR BARRAGAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PHILIPPE DOHERTY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN and ANDREW Y. S. CHENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0619

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRAGAN, JULIO CEZAR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA J C PROFESSIONAL WINDOW CLEANING

Defendants

S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC

1839 Ygnacio Valley Rd.

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

DOHERTY, PHILIPPE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PARTNER/OWNER/OPERATOR OF S & J MAINTENANCE LLC

TERRY, RONALD

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

TERRY, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PARTNER/OWNER/OPERATOR OF S & J MAINTENANCE LLC

DOES I TO X INCLUSIVE

DOHERTY, PHILIPPE

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVERTHORNE, WILLIS C.

220 Montgomery St, Suite 1117

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

PERELMAN, MARK SCOTT

Attorney at MURPHY, PEARSON, BRADLEY & FEENEY

88 Kearny Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108-5530

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARRAGAN, JULIO CEZAR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA J C PROFESSIONAL WINDOW CLEANING AS TO DEFENDANT DOHERTY, PHILIPPE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PARTNER/OWNER/OPERATOR OF S & J MAINTENANCE LLC TERRY, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PARTNER/OWNER/OPERATOR OF S & J MAINTENANCE LLC S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC DOES I TO X INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-10-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-10-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-18-2017

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS PHILIPPE DOHERTY, RONALD TERRY, AND SJ MAINTENANCE LLCs AN

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61267204) FILED BY DEFENDANT S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC DOHERTY, PHILIPPE TERRY, RONALD

Substitution of Attorney for Defendant Ronald Terry

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 61411334): PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR PERELMAN, MARK SCOTT AS ATTORNEY FOR TERRY, RONALD

Substitution of Attorney for Defendant Philippe Doherty

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 61411334): PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR PERELMAN, MARK SCOTT AS ATTORNEY FOR DOHERTY, PHILIPPE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 61470873) FILED BY DEFENDANT S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC HEARING SET FOR JAN-03-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 61470873) FILED BY DEFENDANT S ' J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-10-2018 CONTINUED TO FEB-14-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS' MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, (TRANSACTION ID # 61606724): PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR PERELMAN, MARK SCOTT AS ATTORNEY FOR S ' J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-20-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-14-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100031030) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARRAGAN, JULIO CEZAR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA J C PROFESSIONAL WINDOW CLEANING ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

MINUTES FOR AUG-20-2018 9:30 AM

MINUTES FOR AUG-20-2018 9:30 AM

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BARRAGAN, JULIO CEZAR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA J C PROFESSIONAL WINDOW CLEANING RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TERRY, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PARTNER/OWNER/OPERATOR OF S & J MAINTENANCE LLC S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC DOHERTY, PHILIPPE $22,780.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $22,780.00, PLAINTIFF SHALL BE ENTITLED TO 10% PER ANNUM ON $18,780 FROM MAY 26, 2016. COSTS OF SUITS TO BE DETERMINED IN SUBSEQUENT COURT PROCEEDINGS. SEE SCANNED DOC

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100046754)

Memorandum of Costs

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $1,424.10 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE SEP-17-2018,, (TRANSACTION ID # 100046754) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARRAGAN, JULIO CEZAR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA J C PROFESSIONAL WINDOW CLEANING

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4917C18R003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4917C18M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1350; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R1117A24F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W0917809F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $1,424.10 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE SEP-17-2018,, (TRANSACTION ID # 100046754) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARRAGAN, JULIO CEZAR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA J C PROFESSIONAL WINDOW CLEANING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100046754)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BARRAGAN, JULIO CEZAR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA J C PROFESSIONAL WINDOW CLEANING RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TERRY, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PARTNER/OWNER/OPERATOR OF S & J MAINTENANCE LLC S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC DOHERTY, PHILIPPE $22,780.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $22,780.00, PLAINTIFF SHALL BE ENTITLED TO 10% PER ANNUM ON $18,780 FROM MAY 26, 2016. COSTS OF SUITS TO BE DETERMINED IN SUBSEQUENT COURT PROCEEDINGS. SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • COURT TRIAL ON AUG-20-2018 OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ENTERED. JUDGE ANDREW Y.S. CHENG, CLERK C. BANAYAD, NOT REPORTED (606)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • TRIAL CONCLUDED IN 2.5 HRS. (606)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • TRIAL COMMENCED (606)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2018
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, MURPHY PEARSON BRADLEY & FEENEY&S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT S&J MAINTENANCE LLC IS GRANTED. MOVING PARTY TO PREPARE AND SUBMIT BY EMAIL A PROPOSED ORDER LISTING THE DEFENDANT&S CURRENT ADDRESS AND THE FUTURE HEARING DATE(S) IN THIS CASE. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: G. GONZALES; REYES F. HUNTER, CSR#6576, EMAIL: RHUNTER@SFTC.ORG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-10-2018 CONTINUED TO FEB-14-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FOR MOTION OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD-CIVIL (TRANSACTION ID # 61470873) FILED BY DEFENDANT S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 61470873) FILED BY DEFENDANT S ' J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 61470873) FILED BY DEFENDANT S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC HEARING SET FOR JAN-03-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 61411334): PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR PERELMAN, MARK SCOTT AS ATTORNEY FOR DOHERTY, PHILIPPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 61411334): PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR PERELMAN, MARK SCOTT AS ATTORNEY FOR TERRY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61267204) FILED BY DEFENDANT S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC DOHERTY, PHILIPPE TERRY, RONALD (Fee:$1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARRAGAN, JULIO CEZAR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA J C PROFESSIONAL WINDOW CLEANING AS TO DEFENDANT DOHERTY, PHILIPPE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PARTNER/OWNER/OPERATOR OF S & J MAINTENANCE LLC TERRY, RONALD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PARTNER/OWNER/OPERATOR OF S & J MAINTENANCE LLC S & J MAINTENANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC DOES I TO X INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-10-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-10-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-18-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0619
Case Title:JULIO CEZAR BARRAGAN VS. PHILIPPE DOHERTY ET AL
Court Date:JAN-03-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 3, 2018, LINE 19ATTORNEYS' MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT S & J MAINTENANCE LLC Hearing required. =302/hk


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERELMAN, MARK SCOTT