Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/18/2019 at 03:12:56 (UTC).

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, VS. JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2009 JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, TOMAR MASON, LILLIAN K. SING, CURTIS KARNOW, ARLENE T. BORICK, WALLACE P. DOUGLASS, HAROLD E. KAHN, JOHN K. STEWART and MARLA J. MILLER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5036

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

TOMAR MASON

LILLIAN K. SING

CURTIS KARNOW

ARLENE T. BORICK

WALLACE P. DOUGLASS

HAROLD E. KAHN

JOHN K. STEWART

MARLA J. MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Cross Defendant

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT COMPANY

JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC.

JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO.

DOES 1 TO 10

JACOBS FACILITIES, INC.

JACOB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Cross Defendants and Appellants

ROES 1-10

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

DOES 1 TO 10

Other

MARSH USA, INC., DBA MARSH RISK & INSURANCE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KLINGER, MARILYN SYDNEY

Attorney at SMTD LAW LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue, Ste 2450

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KRAUSE, PETER A.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

1300 "I" Street, Ste 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KEESAL, JR, SAMUEL A.

Attorney at KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN

400 Oceangate,, P.O. Box 1730

Long Beach, CA 908011730

DOYEN, MICHAEL R.

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

35 South Grand Avenue, 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 900711560

ALEXANDER, TEREPKA D.

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

35 South Grand Ave., 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 900711560

SPIEGEL, JOHN W.

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

35 South Grand Ave., 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 900711560

KUTSCHER, MARTIE P.

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KOLKEY, DANIEL M

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

555 Mission St.,, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 941052933

Other Attorney

BLANTON, MICHAEL S.

Attorney at HILL, FARRER & BURRILL LLP

One California Plaza, 37Th Fl, 300 South Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Judicial Councils Request for Modification of Proposed Judgment to Sta

JUDICIAL COUNCILS REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT TO STATE THAT PREJUDGMENT INTEREST RUNS ONLY TO THE DATE OF THE ORIGINAL JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 59997630) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

ORDER

ORDER DENYING PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ADJUDICATION AND RULING ON PLTF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

WITHDRAWAL OF MTN FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT/ALT FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

JUDGMENT ON VERDICT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ON VERDICT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT CROSS COMPLAINANT JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO. RECOVER FROM CROSS DEFENDANT JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS $4,669,376.85 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,669,376.85, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

STIPULATION

STIPULATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR NOTICE AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER FILED BY JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC. JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO. JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

ORDER

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT (DOUGLASS-D608)

ORDER

ORDER MODIFYING OPINION AND DENYING REHEARING, NO CHANGE IN JUDGMENT (A140890, A141393 DIV 1)

Jacobs Defendants Motion to Apply Amended Section 7031 to this case

MOTION TO APPLY AMENDED SECTION 7031 TO THIS CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 59542606) FILED BY DEFENDANT JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC. JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO.

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN T. RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF JUDICIAL COUNCILS O

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN T. RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF JUDICIAL COUNCILS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE UNNAMED CSLB WITNESSES (TRANSACTION ID # 59156209) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

PROOF OF SERVICE [RE THE JUDICIAL COUNCILS MOTIONS IN LIMINE]

PROOF OF SERVICE [RE THE JUDICIAL COUNCILS MOTIONS IN LIMINE] (TRANSACTION ID # 59121959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

Jacobs Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Unnamed CSLB Witnesses

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE UNNAMED CSLB WITNESSES (TRANSACTION ID # 59121674) FILED BY DEFENDANT JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC. JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO.

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS AS TO DEFENDANT JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. JACOB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-07-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-05-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-22-2010 (Fee:EXEMPT)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

MOTION TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY AND DAMAGES FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING UNDER BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 7031(E) FILED BY DEFENDANT JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC. JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT CO.

JURY INSTRUCTIONS

JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT (8.124) FILED BY APPELLANT JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS

449 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2017
  • Payment : ADMINISTER TRUST ACCT; Amount : $50; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8717216A002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Payment : REPORTERS TRANSSCRIPT; Amount : $80; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8717216R001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : Y0117208R006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Payment : NOTICE OF APPEAL - CLERKS DEPOSIT; Amount : $100; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8717131A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE ; Receipt Number : R0216831E002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4916831M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : Y0116510M009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Payment : NOTICE OF APPEAL - CLERKS DEPOSIT; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : W2814320A006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE ; Receipt Number : W2114219M023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Payment : ADMINISTER TRUST ACCT; Amount : $50; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2814207A006

    Read MoreRead Less
654 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS ROES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Fee:$740.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-07-2010 CONTINUED TO JUN-11-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS SERVED MAR-10-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAR-11-2010 AS TO DEFENDANT JACOB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS SERVED MAR-10-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAR-11-2010 AS TO DEFENDANT JACOBS FACILITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS AS TO DEFENDANT JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 JACOBS PROJECT MANAGEMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, ADMIN. OFC. OF THE COURTS AS TO DEFENDANT JACOBS FACILITIES, INC. JACOB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-07-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-05-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-22-2010 (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARSH USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant