Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 14:24:50 (UTC).

JUAN CARLOS AYALA VS. RINA ARACELY CARRERA

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 JUAN CARLOS AYALA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RINA ARACELY CARRERA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8717

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AYALA, JUAN CARLOS

San Francisco, CA 94124

Respondent

CARRERA, RINA ARACELY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS NOV-08-2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT CARRERA, RINA ARACELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: MAR-19-2013 WITH ATTACHED DECLARATION AFTER POSTING FILED BY PETITIONER AYALA, JUAN CARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY POSTING AND MAILING TO LAST KNWON ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY POSTING AND MAILING TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS; AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PETITIONER AYALA, JUAN CARLOS (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PETITIONER AYALA, JUAN CARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER AYALA, JUAN CARLOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER AYALA, JUAN CARLOS AS TO RESPONDENT CARRERA, RINA ARACELY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less