This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 13:25:54 (UTC).

JUAN ALARCON VS. CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2013 JUAN ALARCON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1210

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALARCON, JUAN

Defendants

CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL

GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

DOES 1 TO 30, INCLUSIVE

CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS, INC.

GARCIA, GABINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARABI, PARVIZ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PARVIZ DARABI

500 Airport Blvd.,, Suite 150

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant Attorney

VOLKOV, ALEKSANDR A

211 Gough St, Ste 116

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN AS TO DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-11-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-05-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN AS TO DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES DOES 1 TO 30, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-09-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-08-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-24-2013 (Fee:450.00)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-28-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-11-2014 - CASE SETTLED. NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED 1/24/14. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON OCT-28-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT , CONDITIONAL, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-11-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-05-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN AS TO DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketRECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN AS TO DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN SERVED MAY-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALARCON, JUAN AS TO DEFENDANT CASABLANCA WHOLESALE FLOWERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES ENRIQUEZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL GARCIA, GABINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BELNACIA'S FLORIST & SUPPLIES DOES 1 TO 30, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-09-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-08-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-24-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOLKOV, ALEKSANDR A.