This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 07:27:59 (UTC).

JOYCE VALENTINE VS. HEALD COLLEGE LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2013 JOYCE VALENTINE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HEALD COLLEGE LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9005

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALENTINE, JOYCE

Defendants

CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.

HEALD COLLEGE LLC

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SALMON, CAROLYN

CARTWRIGHT, ROBERT EUGENE

Attorney at THE CARTWRIGHT LAW FIRM, INC.

222 Front Street, Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

BROWN, JEFFREY K.

Attorney at PAYNE & FEARS LLPJAMBOREE CENTER

4 Park Plaza, Ste 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALENTINE, JOYCE AS TO DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC. DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-31-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-29-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-16-2013 (Fee:450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALENTINE, JOYCE SERVED FEB-28-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-03-2013 ON DEFENDANT CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC (Fee:450.00)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CASE (NO SASE, CC IN D302 OUTBOX)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-19-2014 CONTINUED TO MAY-20-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-20-2015 CONTINUED TO SEP-23-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of stay of proceedings

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 15126138) FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-23-2016 CONTINUED TO DEC-21-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALENTINE, JOYCE SERVED FEB-28-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-03-2013 ON DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC. (Fee:450.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALENTINE, JOYCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: CARTWRIGHT, ROBERT EUGENE SUBSTITUTED FOR SALMON, CAROLYN AS ATTORNEY FOR VALENTINE, JOYCE

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-21-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-31-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF REPLY MEMORANDUM ISO DEFS' MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; SUPPLEMENTAL DEC OF MATTHEW J. CUTE ISO DEF HEALD COLLEGE LLC'S AND CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC'S MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON JUL-21-2014. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON NOV-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION. ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CASE FILED 5/16/14. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-23-2015 CONTINUED TO MAR-23-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-23-2016 CONTINUED TO DEC-21-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-23-2015 CONTINUED TO MAR-23-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 15126138) FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-20-2015 CONTINUED TO SEP-23-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-19-2014 CONTINUED TO MAY-20-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON JUL-21-2014. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON NOV-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION. ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CASE FILED 5/16/14. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • CASE NOT ASSIGNED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CASE (NO SASE, CC IN D302 OUTBOX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS HEALD COLLEGE LLC'S AND CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY CASE IS GRANTED. (PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE A FORM OF ORDER.) JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER CSR# 5976.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2013
  • REVIEW FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-21-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-31-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: CARTWRIGHT, ROBERT EUGENE SUBSTITUTED FOR SALMON, CAROLYN AS ATTORNEY FOR VALENTINE, JOYCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALENTINE, JOYCE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC. (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALENTINE, JOYCE SERVED FEB-28-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-03-2013 ON DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALENTINE, JOYCE SERVED FEB-28-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-03-2013 ON DEFENDANT CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALENTINE, JOYCE AS TO DEFENDANT HEALD COLLEGE LLC CORINTHIAN COLLEGES, INC. DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-31-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-29-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-16-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less