This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 02:38:27 (UTC).

JOWONNA BUTLER et al VS. EDGAR GARCIA et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2012 JOWONNA BUTLER filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against EDGAR GARCIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7634

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUTLER, BLYTH

BUTLER, JOWONNA

GALVAN, RICARDO

Defendants

CORDOVA, JAMES

TOPAZ FINANCIAL SERVICES INC DBA ABACUS REALTY

TAN, GLORIA

KOH, JAMES

CREAGER, JANE

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

TAN, SANTIAGO

TOPAZ FINANCIAL SERVICES

GARCIA, EDGAR

ABACUS REALTY

MORALES, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLAR, JAMES MARK

Attorney at MILLAR & ASSOCIATES APLC

100 Montgomery, Ste 1600

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

WIGGS, GEOFFREY E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GEOFF WIGGS

1900 S Norfolk St, Ste #350

San Mateo, CA 94403

CHINCHILLA, HECTOR JOSE

Attorney at CAZADORES LAW GROUP PC

2595 Mission Street, Suite 204

San Francisco, CA 94110

HERRIN, MICHON

Attorney at BLEDSOE, CATHCART, DIESTEL, PEDERSEN & TREPPA LLP

601 California Street, 1Tth Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

GINDER, ERIC R

Attorney at THE GINDER LAW GROUP

120 Tustin Avenue, Ste C-1095

Newport Beach, CA 92663

 

Court Documents

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

MOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE HEARING SET FOR SEP-17-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, JOWONNA BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF JAMES M MILLAR IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, JOWONNA BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO

REPLY

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE

ORDER

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, JOWONNA BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT KOH, JAMES MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES TAN, GLORIA HEARING SET FOR DEC-21-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT KOH, JAMES MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES TAN, GLORIA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT KOH, JAMES MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES TAN, GLORIA

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KOH, JAMES MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-17-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF MARIA MORALES IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MO FOR SUM JUDGT FILED BY DEFENDANT KOH, JAMES MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES TAN, GLORIA

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF OCCUPANT JENNA BARABAD IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MO FOR SUM JUDGT FILED BY DEFENDANT KOH, JAMES MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES TAN, GLORIA

MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL &/OR SETTLEMENT CONF.

MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO HEARING SET FOR SEP-24-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL &/OR SETTLEMENT CONF.

MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO HEARING SET FOR SEP-24-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:60.00)

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO BE RELIEVE AS COUNSEL FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE KOH, JAMES MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES HEARING SET FOR JAN-14-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: CHINCHILLA, HECTOR JOSE SUBSTITUTED FOR WIGGS, GEOFFREY E AS ATTORNEY FOR CORDOVA, JAMES

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2014
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $30.00 RE 31626 FOR TRANSACTION W1513408O010 (OVERPAYMENT), PAYABLE TO JAMES MILLAR, WARRANT #38003464, DATED SEP-29-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-12-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-24-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-12-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO AS TO DEFENDANT MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES TAN, GLORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE/ACCEPTANCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO AS TO DEFENDANT MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES TAN, GLORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENAS AND FOR IMPOSTIION OF SANCTIONS, OFF CALENDAR, CASE SETTLED AS REPORTED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR APR-21-2014 - CASE SETTLED WITH SETTLEMENT MANAGER, PANG LY, IN DEPT. 603. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUN-24-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
250 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, JOWONNA BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, JOWONNA BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT ; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE HEARING SET FOR MAY-09-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ; MEMO P/A FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE HEARING SET FOR MAY-09-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, JOWONNA BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ; MEMO OF P&A IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE HEARING SET FOR APR-25-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:820.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL EVICTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUTLER, JOWONNA BUTLER, BLYTH GALVAN, RICARDO AS TO DEFENDANT GARCIA, EDGAR CREAGER, JANE KOH, JAMES MORALES, MARIA CORDOVA, JAMES DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-29-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-26-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-14-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less