This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:40:35 (UTC).

JOSEPH TOMLINSON et al VS. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2007 JOSEPH TOMLINSON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4247

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

WARREN PUMPS, LLC (F/K/A WARREN PUMPS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO THE QUIMBY PUMP COMPANY)

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

ALFA LAVAL, INC.

CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ALDRICH COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

CUMMINS, INC. (F/K/A CUMMINS ENGINEER COMPANY, INC.)

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FKA THE DURIRON COMPANY, INC.

CRANE CO.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

FLOWSERVE US, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO FLOWSERVE FSD CORP., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DELAVAL TURBINE, INC.)

HERCULES ENGINEERING, INC. (F/K/A WHITE ENGINES, INC., F/K/A WHITE ACQUISITION CORPORATION), INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WHITE ENGINES, INC. (F/K/A HERCULES ENGINES, INC.)

DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC (F/K/A DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION)

ETHYL CORPORATION

M. SLAYEN & ASSOCIATES, INC.

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FKA DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, IMPROPERLY DENOMINATED HEREIN AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO FLOWSERVE FED CORP, SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURCO INTERNATIONAL, INC., F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY, INC.)

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

LOPEZ, RONALD FRANK

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY

One Embarcadero Ctr., 18 Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, #1800

San Francisco, CA 94111-3993

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

Other Attorneys

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GLASPY & GLASPY, INC.

100 Pringle Avenue, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHINING, CAROLIN K.

Attorney at BARON & BUDD, P.C.

9465 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 460

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

SHAFFERY, JOHN

Poole & Shaffery, Llp, 445 South Figueroa St. #2520

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

LANGDOC, JOHN

Attorney at BARON & BUDD, P.C.

3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Ste 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF JOHN LANGDOC In Support of and Filed Concurrently With: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFFS??? MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENTS TO THE COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AMENDMENTS IDENTIFYING CERTAIN DOE DEFENDANTS

DECLARATION OF JOHN LANGDOC IN SUPPORT OF AND FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENTS TO THE COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AMENDMENTS IDENTIFYING CERTAIN DOE DEFENDANTS (TRANSACTION ID # 15816153) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III

Proof of Service of Summons for Defendant Bon L. Manufacturing Company (Baron & Budd)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT & COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15833222), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III SERVED JUL-01-2007, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BON L. MANUFACTURING COMPANY (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CAPITOL PRODUCTS CORPORATION, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DAVIS ENGINEERING CORPORATION)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (Flowserve US)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 22046799) AS TO DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO FLOWSERVE FSD CORP., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

EXHIBITS T THROUGH EE IN SUPPORT OF THE DECLARATION OF E. JACOB LUBARSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

EXHIBITS T THROUGH EE IN SUPPORT OF THE DECLARATION OF E. JACOB LUBARSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 22435343) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. HUNTOON IN SUPPORT OF BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - Tomlinson SFSC 274247

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. HUNTOON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 22442880) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

3. SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 22473475) IN SUPP OF MO FOR SUM JUDGT FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

4. DECLARATION OF MOLLY MCKAY IN SUPPORT OF INGERSOLL-RAND.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;

DECLARATION OF MOLLY MCKAY IN SUPPORT OF INGERSOLL-RAND.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; (TRANSACTION ID # 22473475) FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

5. DECLARATION OF ANDREA BEAN IN SUPPORT OF INGERSOLL-RAND.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;

DECLARATION OF ANDREA BEAN IN SUPPORT OF INGERSOLL-RAND.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; (TRANSACTION ID # 22473475) FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23478695) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

Def. FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, fka Durametallic Corporation, improperly denominated herein as successor-by-merger to Flowserve FED Corp, successor-by-merger to Durametallic Corporations Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Wrongful Death-Asbestos.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15739926) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FKA DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, IMPROPERLY DENOMINATED HEREIN AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO FLOWSERVE FED CORP, SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Proof of Service of Summons for Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company (Baron & Budd)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT & COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15833176), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III SERVED JUL-03-2007, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ALDRICH COMPANY

DEFENDANT J.T.THORPE & SON, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL-ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16034715) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suport of Defendant McNish Corporations Motion to Compel Discovery RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS AND FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS AND FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 19227318) FILED BY DEFENDANT MCNISH CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS NEXIS FILE & SERVE

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS NEXIS FILE & SERVE (TRANSACTION ID # 22430853) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Request for Dismissal of FORD MOTOR COMPANY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23270605) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HAVE HEARD PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINTUE TRIAL GROUP 2

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HAVE HEARD PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINTUE TRIAL GROUP 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 23338560) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III (Fee:40.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23338560) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23549865) AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

277 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2010
  • PER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:1096.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-21-2009 . DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 9/1/09. JUDGE: JAMES J. MCBRIDE; CLERK: E. BURA; REPORTER: SCOTT HUGHES, CSR# 12365 (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 26864456) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 26864456)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 26215387) FILED BY DEFENDANT M. SLAYEN & ASSOCIATES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-26-2009 - ON COURT'S MOTION. NOT REPORTED, (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION /SECOND AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT WARRN PUMPS REGARDING EXTENSION TO FILE MOTION TO TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 24894089) FILED BY WARREN PUMPS, LLC TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED, WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 24456744) AS TO DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DELAVAL TURBINE, INC.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION / AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION TO FILE MO TO TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 24351634) FILED BY WARREN PUMPS, LLC TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS REGARDING EXTENSION TO FILE MOTION TO TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 23770112) FILED BY WARREN PUMPS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
311 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 15557286) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15557286) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15557286) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 15521453) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TIME. (TRANSACTION ID # 15521453) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15521453) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • JURY FEES, TRAN # R0207625J015, TAG # 018578 (TRANSACTION ID # 15344989) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOMLINSON, JOSEPH APPEARS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT ROBERT FRANCIS LEMM, JR., DECEASED CARR, GREG ANTLEY, COYLEE LEMM, ROBERT III AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ALFA LAVAL, INC. ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIBILITY TRUST D0ES 1-300 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS-SEE ATTACHED SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethyl Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant