This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:21:40 (UTC).

JOSEPH POSEDEL VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2007 JOSEPH POSEDEL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4045

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POSEDEL, JOSEPH

Defendants

TRANE US INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

GRINNELL LLC

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

FAMILIAN CORPORATION

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

CRANE CO.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION , F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

ADVOCATE MINES, LTD.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

COWPERTHWAITE, JOHN GRAHAM

Attorney at BENNETT, SAMUELSEN, REYNOLDS & ALLARD, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1301 Marina Village Parkway, Ste 300

Alameda, CA 94501

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

BERTRAND, JEAN LYNNE

One Market Spear Street Tower, Thirty-Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Other Attorneys

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at STEEFEL, LEVITT & WEISS

1 Embarcadero Center, 30Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

HILLYARD, MARY KIRK

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste. 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

FONG, CAMILLE KAMEE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21986435) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21986435) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

EXHIBIT E TO DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

EXHIBIT E TO DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21986435) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHER?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 23472245) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POSEDEL, JOSEPH

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 456 FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 456 FOR TRIAL, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 24301730) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POSEDEL, JOSEPH HEARING SET FOR APR-16-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:40.00)

DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORP., NOTICE OF MOTION TO SEVER ACTION FROM TRIAL GROUP AND VACATE TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF MOTION TO SEVER ACTION FROM TRIAL GROUP AND VACATE TRIAL DATE, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 24607934) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR APR-16-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 26005217) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION

PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EXAMINATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES REGARDING ?BUT FOR? PROXIMATE CAUSE

PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EXAMINATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES REGARDING BUT FOR PROXIMATE CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 26816911) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POSEDEL, JOSEPH

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21794897) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POSEDEL, JOSEPH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21814086) FILED BY PLAINTIFF POSEDEL, JOSEPH

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXISNEXIS FILE & SERVE (Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition)

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXISNEXIS FILE SERVE (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION) (TRANSACTION ID # 21926444) FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

EXHIBIT H TO DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

EXHIBIT H TO DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21986435) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 23617604) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. MOSES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DANA CORPORATION (now known as DANA COMPANIES, LLC)?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 456 FOR TRIAL

DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. MOSES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MO FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 456 FOR TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA CORPORATION (NOW KNOWN AS DANA COMPANIES, LLC) [CASE # 443623 OLSEN VS ASBESTOS DEFTS (BP)] (TRANSACTION ID # 24517437)

COMPENDIUM OF OUT-OF-STATE AND FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DANA CORPORATION (now known as DANA COMPANIES, LLC)?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 456 FOR TRIAL (TWO OF TWO)

COMPENDIUM OF OUT-OF-STATE AND FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MO FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 456 FOR TRIAL (TWO OF TWO) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA CORPORATION (NOW KNOWN AS DANA COMPANIES, LLC) [CASE # 443623 OLSEN VS ASBESTOS DEFTS (BP)] (TRANSACTION ID # 24517437)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 26775757) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Notice of Continued Settlement Conference

ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEP-22-2009 CONTINUED TO SEP-23-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN 502. BR456 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. [IN TRIAL WITH JUDGE STEWART] MATTER CONTINUED FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. JUDGE ROBERTSON; CLERK: V. MU; NOT REPORTED (502)

289 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 30659532) AS TO DEFENDANT VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R0908A30J035 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29091073) AS TO DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 28820238) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28737527) AS TO DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28316353) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28046460) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27952860) AS TO DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27714530) AS TO DEFENDANT WESTBURNE SUPPLY INC. P.E. O'HAIR CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27674748) AS TO DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
376 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14418702) FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14418516) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON ANSWER; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 14303976) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 14303976) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14303976) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14303976) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14279732) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF POSEDEL, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF POSEDEL, JOSEPH AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less