This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:08:54 (UTC).

JOSEPH FANELLI VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2007 JOSEPH FANELLI filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4009

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

DOMCO PRODUCT TEXAS INC.

AMERICAN MOTORS CORPORATION

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

SQUARE D COMPANY

SEE ATTACHED LIST

SPECIAL MATERIALS, INC. - WISCONSIN

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

FAMILIAN CORPORATION

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

R. G. FISHER CONSTRUCTORS

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC. (SUED HEREIN AS DOE #14 AND #1005)

LAWSON MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 N Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

COWPERTHWAITE, JOHN GRAHAM

Attorney at BENNETT, SAMUELSEN, REYNOLDS & ALLARD, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1301 Marina Village Parkway, Ste 300

Alameda, CA 94501

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

BURKE, JOHN ANTHONY

Attorney at BISHOP, BARRY, HOWE, HANEY & RYDER

2000 Powell St, Ste 1425

Emeryville, CA 94608

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at STEEFEL, LEVITT & WEISS

1 Embarcadero Center, 30Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR P

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13840670) FILED BY DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

FAMILIAN CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBEST

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13950287) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13959853) FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Proof of service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14999830), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FANELLI, JOSEPH SERVED FEB-16-2007, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND DEFAULT OF MAY-24-2007 SET ASIDE

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 17555147) AS TO DEFENDANT MCDONALD SUPPLY CO., INC.

DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 19435479) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA CORPORATION (NOW KNOWN AS DANA COMPANIES LLC) HEARING SET FOR MAY-16-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:375.00)

Answer to Complaint - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22170530) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE BROS. (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF DAVID R. DONADIO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF DAVID R. DONADIO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22880726) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FANELLI, JOSEPH

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 26601005) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 26689453) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

DECLARATION OF RYAN C. BLACKHART IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF RYAN C. BLACKHART IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 26689453) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

Declaration of Counsel in Support

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 26699982) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE BROS.

DECLARATION OF JAMES E. HAMM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF JAMES E. HAMM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 26706683) FILED BY DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANY

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF QUESTIONS AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANYa??S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF QUESTIONS AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 26771041) FILED BY DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANY

DECLARATION OF NANCY ZABALA GRAHAM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANYa??S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE

DECLARATION OF NANCY ZABALA GRAHAM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE (TRANSACTION ID # 26771041) FILED BY DEFENDANT RIDGE TOOL COMPANY

DECLARATION OF ALICE Y. AHN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE BRAYTON GROUP 509

DECLARATION OF ALICE Y. AHN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE BRAYTON GROUP 509 (TRANSACTION ID # 27671069)

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ALL REFERENCE AND TESTIMONY REGARDING OSTENSIBLE BACKGROUND OR AMBIENT EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ALL REFERENCE AND TESTIMONY REGARDING OSTENSIBLE BACKGROUND OR AMBIENT EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS (TRANSACTION ID # 30651731) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FANELLI, JOSEPH

222 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-02-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ATTY. JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF JUL-10-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-02-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, OREN NOAH. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-03-2014 TO JUL-10-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-03-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: RVELUZ/EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JUN-20-2013 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON DEC-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41148095) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-16-2010 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206 FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER DIANA L. GONZALEZ, CSR #7935, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL, BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
262 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 13726859) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANYS OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 13726859) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 13726859) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13726859) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13722420) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOES 1 AND 1001 TO BE ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE MCDONALD SUPPLY CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13720820) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13719176) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF FANELLI, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FANELLI, JOSEPH AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-20-2007 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less