Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:48:33 (UTC).

JOSE HERNANDEZ VS. G680 GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 JOSE HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against G680 GROUP, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8456

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ, JOSE

Defendants

G680 GROUP DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA

THIRD & MISSION ASSOCS LLC

G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA

A.G. FERRARI FOODS

DOES 1 TO 30

THIRD AND MISSION ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAL, CAMERON H.

CAMERON, H. MAL

P.O. Box 1539

Pleasanton, CA 94566

Defendant Attorney

BURKE, MICHAEL S

Attorney at VOGL & MEREDITH

456 Montgomery St 20Th Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE AS TO DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA THIRD & MISSION ASSOCS LLC DOES 1 TO 30 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-21-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA (Fee:450.00)

NOTICE

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA FILED BY DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-01-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) THIRD & MISSION ASSOCS LLC. THE AUG-21-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-01-2013 CONTINUED TO DEC-03-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) THIRD & MISSION ASSOCS LLC. THE OCT-01-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-23-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100012081)

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-12-2016 CONTINUED TO FEB-23-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Response to OSC_1127319

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100011494) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JAN-12-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE OCT-27-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Response to OSC_1109722

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100007292) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE

Notice of Settlement_1108683

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100007058) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 100006630) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE AS TO DEFENDANT A.G. FERRARI FOODS

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100001428), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE SERVED JUN-28-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT A.G. FERRARI FOODS

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-23-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100012081)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-12-2016 CONTINUED TO FEB-23-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100011494) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JAN-12-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE OCT-27-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100007292) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100007058) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 100006630) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE AS TO DEFENDANT A.G. FERRARI FOODS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100001428), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE SERVED JUN-28-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT A.G. FERRARI FOODS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-23-2015 CONTINUED TO OCT-27-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) A.G. FERRARI FOODS. THE JUN-23-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-01-2013 CONTINUED TO DEC-03-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) THIRD & MISSION ASSOCS LLC. THE OCT-01-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-01-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) THIRD & MISSION ASSOCS LLC. THE AUG-21-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA FILED BY DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-21-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, JOSE AS TO DEFENDANT G680 GROUP, INC. DBA THE GROVE YERBA BUENA THIRD & MISSION ASSOCS LLC DOES 1 TO 30 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less