Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 10:28:39 (UTC).

JORGE ESPINOZA et al VS. NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2010 JORGE ESPINOZA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5905

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESPINOZA, JORGE

ESCOLERO, SONIA

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS

PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRASSO, RUSSELL F

Attorney at FOREMAN & BRASSO

930 Montgomery Street,Ste 600

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorney

INNES, LAURA ELIZABETH

Attorney at SIMPSON, GARRITY & INNES; A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

601 Gateway Boulevard, Suite 950

South San Francisco, CA 94080

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS DOES 1 TO 20 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-11-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-09-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-27-2010 (Fee:370.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT NOTICE TO PLTF; ADR PROGRAMS, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA SERVED JAN-14-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS

ORDER

ORDER RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE (NO SASE OR COPY)

ORDER

ORDER RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-11-2010 CONTINUED TO JUL-23-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS DOES 1 TO 20

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-12-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 602. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-23-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-28-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-09-2011 AT 2:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 624. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATE

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEB-09-2011 CONTINUED TO MAY-18-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN 624. (206)

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-10-2010 CONTINUED TO MAR-09-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Rescheduled Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-18-2011 CONTINUED TO MAY-20-2011 AT 10:30 AM IN 624.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS)

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Case Ordered Off Calendar

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-09-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2011
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-06-2011 - DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-20-2011 - DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-09-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-04-2011 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION, 301, NO APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFFS JORGE ESPINOZA AND SONIA ESCOLERO'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR PER MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN, CSR # 8189 =301/PJB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DECLARATION OF SARAH E. LUCAS IN SUPP OF OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLT; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLT; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAIONT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA HEARING SET FOR FEB-04-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2010
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR MAR-16-2010 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR MAR-16-2010 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2010
  • REPLY MEMO OF P&A IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS) HEARING SET FOR MAR-16-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT PIER RESTAURANTS, L.P. DBA NEPTUNE'S PALACE SEAFOOD RESTAURANT (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS) HEARING SET FOR MAR-16-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT NOTICE TO PLTF; ADR PROGRAMS, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA SERVED JAN-14-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOZA, JORGE ESCOLERO, SONIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPTUNE PALACE RESTAURANT DBA PIER 39 RESTAURANTS DOES 1 TO 20 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-11-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-09-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-27-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PIER RESTAURANTS LP is a litigant